United States v. Firtash
Criminal Case Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cr-00515
District Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 28, 2019 at 1:38 AM DT (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Firtash, Dmitry, Defendant
Officially listed as "Dmitry Firtash"

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
also known as
Dmytro Firtash
also known as
DF Alison S Cooney +1 312 558 5826 acooney@winston.com
also known as
Dmytro Firtash
also known as
DF Chris J. Stathopoulos +1 312 558 5600 +1 312 558 5700 mcarter@winston.com
also known asDmytro Firtash
also known asDF DANIEL K. WEBB +1 312 558 5600 +1 312 558 5700 dwebb@winston.com
also known as
Dmytro Firtash
also known as
DF DANIEL K. WEBB +1 312 558 5600 +1 312 558 5700 dwebb@winston.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (71) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/22/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        LETTER from Dan K. Webb dated 10/9/2018 Re: Fourth Update on the Austrian Extradition Proceedings in U.S. v. Firtash, No. 13 CR 515. (Webb, Dan) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          REPLY by Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp to MOTION by Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp for leave to File Supplemental Authority in Support of Their Motions to Dismiss the Indictment 63 (In Support) (Webb, Dan) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: 9/25/2018 Order on motion for extension of time
            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp : Defendants Dmitry Firtash and Andras Knopp's unopposed motion for extension of time to file a reply in support of their motion for leave to file supplement authority 71 is granted for an additional ten days, without an appearance. Mailed notice. (etv, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE of Motion by Dan K. Webb for presentment of motion for extension of time 71 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 9/27/2018 at 08:45 AM. (Webb, Dan) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 extension of time
                MOTION by Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp for extension of time as to motion for leave to 63 File Supplemental Authority in support of their pending motions to dismiss the indictment (Webb, Dan)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  RESPONSE by USA as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp regarding MOTION by Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp for leave to File Supplemental Authority in Support of Their Motions to Dismiss the Indictment 63, MOTION by Dmitry Firtash to dismiss the Indictment 24, MOTION by Andras Knopp to dismiss Indictment 30 Government's Second Supplemental Response to Defendant Firtash's and Knopp's Motions to Dismiss Indictment (Bhachu, Amarjeet) (Entered: 09/22/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: 9/18/2018 1 - Terminate Hearings
                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp : Government's unopposed motion for extension of time to file supplemental brief 67 is granted for an additional seven days, without an appearance. Reply to be filed seven days thereafter. Mailed notice. (etv, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE of Motion by Amarjeet Singh Bhachu for presentment of motion for extension of time 67 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 9/20/2018 at 08:45 PM. (Bhachu, Amarjeet) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 extension of time
                        MOTION by USA for extension of time as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp (Bhachu, Amarjeet)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None 1 - Terminate Hearings
                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp: Motion hearing held on 9/5/2018. Dmitry Firtash and Andras Knopp's motion for leave to file supplement authority in support of their motion to dismiss the indictment [630 is entered and continued for briefing. Response to be filed within ten (10) days; reply to be filed seven (7) days thereafter. Mailed notice. (etv, ) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE of Motion by Dan K. Webb for presentment of motion for leave to 63 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 9/5/2018 at 08:45 AM. (Webb, Dan) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                MEMORANDUM by Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp in support of MOTION by Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp for leave to File Supplemental Authority in Support of Their Motions to Dismiss the Indictment 63 (Webb, Dan) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018 Leave to
                                  MOTION by Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp for leave to File Supplemental Authority in Support of Their Motions to Dismiss the Indictment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Webb, Dan)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS as to Dmitry Firtash and Andras Knopp held on 7/2/18, before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Order Number: 31367. Court Reporter Contact Information: Frances Ward (312)435-5561 - wardofficialtranscripts@gmail.com.IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 8/20/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/30/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/29/2018. (Ward, Frances) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp: Status hearing held on 7/2/2018. Additional briefs, if any, to be filed within seven (7) days. Mailed notice. (etv, ) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Description not available
                                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp: By agreement, status hearing is set for 7/2/2018 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, ) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                          LETTER from Dan Webb dated 4/17/18 Re: Third Update on Proceedings in Europe Related to U.S. v. Firtash, No. 13 CR 515. (Webb, Dan) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                            LETTER from Dan K. Webb dated 3/16/2018 Re: Second Update on Proceedings in Europe Related to U.S. v. Firtash. (Webb, Dan) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                              LETTER from Dan K. Webb dated 12/20/2017 regarding Update on Austrian Expedition Proceedings. (Webb, Dan) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous-Other
                                                Government's Supplemental Brief in Response to Defendants Firtash's and Knopp's Motions to Dismiss Indictment by USA as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp (Bhachu, Amarjeet) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: None Memorandum In Support
                                                  MEMORANDUM by Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp in support of MOTION by Dmitry Firtash to dismiss the Indictment 24 (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Webb, Dan) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None transcript
                                                    TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp held on 9/15/17, before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Court Reporter Contact Information: Frances Ward (312)435-5561 - wardofficialtranscripts@gmail.com.IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/10/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/20/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/18/2017. (Ward, Frances) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp: Continued oral argument held on 9/15/2017. Mailed notice. (etv, ) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp held on 9/11/17, before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Court Reporter Contact Information: Frances Ward (312)435-5561 - wardofficialtranscripts@gmail.com.IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter Frances Ward (312)435-5561 before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter Frances Ward (312)435-5561 or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/4/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/16/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2017. (Ward, Frances) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 50 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp: Oral arguments held and continued to 9/15/2017 at 10:45 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, ) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp : Dmitry Firtash's and Andras Knopp's motion for leave to file reply brief exceeding page limit 46 is granted. Mailed notice. (etv, ) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Dan K. Webb for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 46 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 9/11/2017 at 02:00 PM. (Webb, Dan) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                REPLY by Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp to response to motion, 40 Joint Reply of Dmitry Firtash and Andras Knopp to the Government's Consolidated Response to Defendant Firtash's and Knopp's Motion to Dismiss Indictment (Webb, Dan) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MOTION by Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp for leave to file brief in excess of fifteen pages (Joint) (Webb, Dan) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for defendant Dmitry Firtash by Alison S Cooney (Cooney, Alison) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for defendant Dmitry Firtash by Matthew Robert Carter (Carter, Matthew) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp: By agreement, oral argument on motions to dismiss set for 9/6/2017 is stricken and re-set to 9/11/2017 at 2:00 PM. Mailed notice. (etv, ) (Entered: 08/23/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: 7/31/2017 Description not available
                                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp: By agreement, reply in support of motion to dismiss extended to 8/30/2017. Oral argument set for 8/25/2017 is stricken and re-set to 9/6/2017 at 2:00 PM. Mailed notice. (etv, )
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: 7/25/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp : Government's unopposed motion to file response in excess of fifteen page limit 38 is granted. Mailed notice. (etv, )
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 40 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              RESPONSE by USA as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp regarding MOTION by Dmitry Firtash to dismiss the Indictment 24 , MOTION by Andras Knopp to dismiss Indictment 30 Government's Consolidated Response to Defendant Firtash's and Knopp's Motions to Dismiss Indictment (Bhachu, Amarjeet) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                NOTICE of Motion by Amarjeet Singh Bhachu for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 38 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/25/2017 at 10:00 AM. (Bhachu, Amarjeet) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    MOTION by USA for leave to file brief in excess of fifteen pages as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp Government's Unopposed Motion to File Response in Excess of Fifteen Page Limit (Bhachu, Amarjeet) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: 7/10/2017 Description not available
                                                                                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp: By agreement, Government's response to motion to dismiss extended to and including 7/24/2017;reply extended to 8/16/2017. Mailed notice. (etv, )
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for USA byMichael Thomas Donovan (Donovan, Michael) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: 5/17/2017 Description not available
                                                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: as to Dmitry Firtash: Defendants' reply briefs to be filed by or on 8/9/2017; oral argument set for 8/25/2017 at 10:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, )
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            ATTORNEY Appearance for USA byJonathan Robell (Robell, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: 5/11/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Dmitry Firtash's motion to dismiss the indictment 24 is entered and continued for briefing. Government's response to be filed by or on 7/17/2017. Dmitry Firtash's motion for leave to file brief in excess of fifteen pages 22 granted, without an appearance. Presentation date of 5/17/2017 is stricken. Mailed notice. (etv, )
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion by Dan K. Webb for presentment of motion to dismiss 24 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/17/2017 at 08:45 AM. (Webb, Dan) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by Dmitry Firtash in support of MOTION by Dmitry Firtash to dismiss the Indictment 24 (Webb, Dan) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/9/2017 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                    MOTION by Dmitry Firtash to dismiss the Indictment (Webb, Dan)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Dan K. Webb for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 22 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/17/2017 at 08:45 AM. (Webb, Dan) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: 5/9/2017 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                        MOTION by Dmitry Firtash for leave to file brief in excess of fifteen pages (Webb, Dan)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for defendant Dmitry Firtash by Dan K. Webb (Webb, Dan) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT filed by the United States (SEALED). (yap, ) Modified on 10/14/2016 (rao, ). (Entered: 10/13/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT Signed by Honorable Judge Castillo. (yap, ) Modified on 10/2/2015 (rao, ). (Entered: 10/02/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                ORDER as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp, Suren Gevorgyan, Gajendra Lal, Periyasamy Sunderalingam, K.V.P. Ramachandra Rao. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/2/2014. Mailed notice (meg, ) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp, Suren Gevorgyan, Gajendra Lal, Periyasamy Sunderalingam, K.V.P. Ramachandra Rao: Status hearing held on 4/2/2014. Government's oral motion to unseal the indictment is granted. Enter Order. (For Further Detail See Separate Order.) Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/2/2014. Mailed notice (meg, ) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 16 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    SEALED AFFIDAVIT as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp, Suren Gevorgyan, Gajendra Lal, Periyasamy Sunderalingam, K.V.P. Ramachandra Rao. (meg, ) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      SEALED EX PARTE MOTION by USA as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp, Suren Gevorgyan, Gajendra Lal, Periyasamy Sunderalingam, K.V.P. Ramachandra Rao (meg, ) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        SEALED RESTRAINING ORDER as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp, Suren Gevorgyan, Gajendra Lal, Periyasamy Sunderalingam, K.V.P. Ramachandra Rao Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/17/2013. (meg, ) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          SEALED EX PARTE MOTION by USA for a restraining order as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp, Suren Gevorgyan, Gajendra Lal, Periyasamy Sunderalingam, K.V.P. Ramachandra Rao (meg, ) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            SEALED RESTRAING ORDER as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp, Suren Gevorgyan, Gajendra Lal, Periyasamy Sunderalingam, K.V.P. Ramachandra Rao. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/17/2013. Mailed notice (meg, ) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              SEALED EX PARTE Application by USA for a restraining order as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp, Suren Gevorgyan, Gajendra Lal, Periyasamy Sunderalingam, K.V.P. Ramachandra Rao (meg, ) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer as to Dmitry Firtash, also known as "Dmytro Firtash", and "DF" and Andras Knopp are hereby quashed. Warrants for Arrest to be issued as to Dmitry Firtash, also know as "Dmytro Firstash", and "DF" and Andras Knopp on the charges of Racketeering Conspiracy; Money Laundering Conspiracy; Interstate Travel in Aid of Racketeering; and Conspiracy to Commit an Offense against the United States. A copy of the warrants are to be provided to the Assistant United States Attorney Amarjeet Singh Bhachu. Mailed notice (meg, ) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  BENCH WARRANTS issued to U.S. Marshal as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp, Suren Gevorgyan, Gajendra Lal, Periyasamy Sunderalingam, K.V.P. Ramachandra Rao (meg, ) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Maria Valdez s to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp, Suren Gevorgyan, Gajendra Lal, Periyasamy Sunderalingam, K.V.P. Ramachandra Rao: To issue bench warrants as to all defendants. The Government will seek to have the defendants detained without bond pursuant to Title 18, United States Code, Section 3142. The District Court Clerk's Office is directed to disclose to the Assistant U.S. Attorney assigned to this case for the government, the name of the judge, magistrate judge and the docket number assigned to this case in order to expedite the arrest and arraignment of the arrested defendants. Do Not Seal Arrest Warrants. The Government is authorized to disclose any information now under seal in this case, including copies of the indict, warrants of arrest and court orders to interpol and other domestic and foreign authorities as necessary to effect the arrest and extradition of the defendants while otherwise maintaining the case file under seal until further order of the court. Mailed notice (meg, ) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      DESIGNATION Sheet: FELONY (Category II). (meg, ) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        INDICTMENT as to Dmitry Firtash (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3-4, Andras Knopp (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3-4, 5, Suren Gevorgyan (3) count(s) 1, 2, 3-4, 5, Gajendra Lal (4) count(s) 1, 2, 3-4, 5, Periyasamy Sunderalingam (5) count(s) 1, 2, 3-4, 5, K.V.P. Ramachandra Rao (6) count(s) 1, 2, 3-4 with Forfeiture Allegation One and Two. (meg, ) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          SEALED MOTION by USA as to Suppressed (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bhachu, Amarjeet) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None Motion to Unseal Case
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              ORAL MOTION by USA to unseal the indictment as to Dmitry Firtash, Andras Knopp, Suren Gevorgyan, Gajendra Lal, Periyasamy Sunderalingam, K.V.P. Ramachandra Rao (meg, )
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 137 times.

                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?