Mounia Elyazidi v. SunTrust Bank
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 14-1290

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2017 at 8:04 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3450 - Interstate Commerce
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405013343 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellant Mounia Elyazidi. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 06/13/2014. Has district court 90-day restriction expired for all transcripts included in appendix? Not applicable. The electronic appendix is initially restricted to case participants only. Case participants must be logged into CM/ECF to view the appendix prior to public release. Appendices in Immigration and Social Security cases will remain restricted.[999374522] [14-1290] Ernest Francis
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
    ORDER filed [999559509] granting Motion for costs [48] in the amount of 39.60. Copies to all parties.. [14-1290] (MR)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None
      Mandate issued. Referencing: [46] Published Authored Opinion, [47] Judgment Order. Originating case number: 8:13-cv-02204-DKC. [14-1290] (TW)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None
        BILL OF COSTS by Appellees Mitchell Rubenstein & Associates, P.C. and SunTrust Bank. Date and method of service: 03/17/2015 ecf. [14-1290] Ronald Canter
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None
          JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Disposition method: 14-1290 opn.p.arg. Decision: Affirmed. Originating case number: 8:13-cv-02204-DKC. Entered on Docket Date: 03/05/2015. [999540511] Copies to all parties and the district court/agency.. [14-1290] (MR)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None
            PUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Originating case number: 8:13-cv-02204-DKC. [999540510]. [14-1290] (MR)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: None
              COURT ORDER filed [999502846] denying Motion to amend/correct [34] Copies to all parties.. [14-1290] (MR)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None
                CHANGE OF ADDRESS Notice by Mounia Elyazidi... [14-1290] Ernest Francis
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None
                  ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellant Mounia Elyazidi. Counsel arguing: Ernest P. Francis Opening argument time: 15 min. Rebuttal argument time: 5 min, [999493454] [14-1290] Ernest Francis
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None
                    ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellee Mitchell Rubenstein & Associates, P.C.. Counsel arguing: Ronald S. Canter Answering argument time: 15 [999490033] [14-1290] Ronald Canter
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                      BRIEF by Appellees Mitchell Rubenstein & Associates, P.C. and SunTrust Bank in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Response. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. [999394763] [14-1290] Ronald Canter
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                        ORDER filed [999377009] granting Motion to extend filing time [20], accepting brief and appendix for filing one day out of time, extending filing deadline for response brief. Response brief due 07/17/2014 Copies to all parties.. [14-1290] (MR)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
                          MOTION by Appellant Mounia Elyazidi to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until 6/12/2014. Date and method of service: 06/16/2014 ecf. [999376963] [14-1290] Ernest Francis
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 19 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
                            Docket correction requested from Mr. Ernest P. Francis for Mounia Elyazidi.... [14-1290] (MR)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
                              FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellant Mounia Elyazidi. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 06/13/2014. Has district court 90-day restriction expired for all transcripts included in appendix? Not applicable. The electronic appendix is initially restricted to case participants only. Case participants must be logged into CM/ECF to view the appendix prior to public release. Appendices in Immigration and Social Security cases will remain restricted.[999374522] [14-1290] Ernest Francis
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 17 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
                                BRIEF by Appellant Mounia Elyazidi in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Opening. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 06/13/2014. [999374508] [14-1290] Ernest Francis
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                  ORDER filed [999374208] granting Motion to extend filing time [15]. Opening brief and appendix due 06/11/2014. Response brief due 07/16/2014 Copies to all parties.. [14-1290] (MR)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                    MOTION by Appellant Mounia Elyazidi to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until 06/11/2014. Date and method of service: 06/09/2014 ecf. [999372827] [14-1290] Ernest Francis
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                      ORDER filed [999355883] extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until 6/9/17, updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 06/09/2014. Response brief due 07/14/2014 Copies to all parties.. [14-1290] (TW)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                        ORDER filed [999347675] extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until 06/02/2014. Opening brief and appendix due 06/02/2014. Response brief due 07/02/2014. Copies to all parties. [14-1290] (MR)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 12 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
                                          Initial mediation conference scheduled. [14-1290] (SLW)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                            DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Mounia Elyazidi. [14-1290] Ernest Francis
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                              DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Mounia Elyazidi. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999338069] [14-1290] Ernest Francis
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Ernest P. Francis for Mounia Elyazidi.[999338068] [14-1290] Ernest Francis
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Matthew A. Egeli for SunTrust Bank.[999335553] [14-1290] Matthew Egeli
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                    DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee SunTrust Bank. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999335536] [14-1290] John Griffin
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by John R. Griffin for SunTrust Bank.[999335535] [14-1290] John Griffin
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                        DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Mitchell Rubenstein & Associates, P.C.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999328626] [14-1290] Ronald Canter
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                          APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Ronald S. Canter for Mitchell Rubenstein & Associates, P.C..[999328619] [14-1290] Ronald Canter
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                            BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 05/12/2014. Response Brief due 06/16/2014 [14-1290] (MR)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                              DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 8:13-cv-02204-DKC.. [14-1290] (MR)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:13-cv-02204-DKC. Case manager: MRadday. [14-1290] (MR)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 115 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?