Greater New York Taxi Association et al v. The City of New York et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-03089

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 14, 2018 at 11:32 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Evgeny Freidman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin M. Brown +212 212 696 4848 brown@mintzandgold.com
No Logo Greater New York Taxi Association, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz & Gold LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin M. Brown +212 212 696 4848 brown@mintzandgold.com
Space Terence William McCormick +1 212 696 4848 +1 212 696 1231 mccormick@mintzandgold.com
Space Steven Glen Mintz +1 212 696 4848 +1 212 696 1231 mintz@mintzandgold.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin M. Brown +212 212 696 4848 brown@mintzandgold.com
v.
No Logo David Yassky, Defendant
No Logo Does 1-9, Defendant
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael R. Bloomberg"
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City of New York"

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas Robert Ciappetta +1 212 788 0708 +1 212 791 9714 nciappet@law.nyc.gov
No Logo New York City Taxi & Limousine Commission, Defendant
Officially listed as "The New York City Taxi & Limousine Commission"
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Discovery
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Discovery
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER deferring ruling on 23 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. A status conference will be held on May 9, 2014, at 2:45 p.m., in courtroom 518, Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York 10007. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vernon S. Broderick)(Text Only Order) (Broderick, Vernon) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Nicholas R. Ciappetta dated 05/02/2014 re: 23 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Steven G. Mintz dated April 29, 2014. . Document filed by Michael R. Bloomberg(individually ), The City of New York, The New York City Taxi & Limousine Commission, David Yassky(individually). (Ciappetta, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
              LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Steven G. Mintz dated April 29, 2014. Document filed by Evgeny Freidman, Greater New York Taxi Association. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quill, Timothy) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties, as follows: No Waiver by Disclosure. Subject to the provisions of this Stipulation and Order, if a party inadvertently discloses in discovery any documents or information that it thereafter claims to be protected by the attorney-client privilege, attorney work product protection or any other privilege or protection recognized by state or federal law, or discloses in discovery any non-party personal identifying information (collectively referred to hereinafter as "Protected Material"), the disclosure of that Protected Material shall not constitute or be deemed a waiver or forfeiture-in this or any other federal or state action--of any claim of privilege or protection applicable to that Protected Material or its subject mailer; as further set forth herein. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 4/8/2014) (mro) Modified on 4/10/2014 (mro). (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 21 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER. Accordingly, the settlement conference, previously scheduled for April 8, 2014 is ADJOURNED. The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this matter to another Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 4/7/2014) (rjm) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER granting 19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Ex Parte Settlement Letter until April 3, 2014. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn)(Text Only Order) (Netburn, Sarah) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File ex parte settlement letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Steven G. Mintz dated 3/31/2014. Document filed by Evgeny Freidman, Greater New York Taxi Association.(Mintz, Steven) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. A settlement conference is scheduled for Tuesday, April 08, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 219, Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, and as further set forth. (Settlement Conference set for 4/8/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 219, U.S. Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 3/6/2014) (rjm) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. On February 18, 2014, the Honorable Vernon S. Broderick referred this matter to my docket. Pursuant to the February 18, 2014 referral order, the parties are to contact Courtroom Deputy Joseph Mendieta at (212) 805-0286 no later than March 7, 2014, to schedule a settlement conference. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 2/20/2014) (rjm) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Michael Brown on behalf of Evgeny Freidman, Greater New York Taxi Association. (Brown, Kevin) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                              SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: that the parties are to contact Courtroom Deputy Joseph Mendieta at (212) 805-0286 no later than March 7, 2014, to schedule a settlement conference. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 2/20/2014) (tn) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. The parties are directed to contact the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Netburn no later than March 7, 2014 to schedule a settlement conference. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 2/18/2014) (mro) (Main Document 14 replaced on 2/19/2014) (msa). (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. All fact discovery shall be completed by July 16, 2014. 2. On or before July 11,2014, the parties shall file on ECF a joint letter of no more than three (3) pages, addressing the following topics, in separate paragraphs; as set forth herein. 3. A post-discovery conference shall be held on July 18, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. at the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York 10007, Courtroom 518. (Fact Discovery due by 7/16/2014. Status Conference set for 7/18/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 518, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Vernon S. Broderick.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 2/18/2014) (mro) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time on behalf of all parties addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Steven G. Mintz dated February 14, 2014. Document filed by Evgeny Freidman, Greater New York Taxi Association. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mintz, Steven) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER: As Counsel may be aware, this case was recently reassigned to the undersigned. The discovery deadline ordered by Judge Sweet remains in effect. A post-discovery conference will be held on April 18, 2014 at 10:00 a.m., at the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York 10007, Courtroom 518. In addition, on or before April 11, 2014, the parties shall file on ECF a joint letter of no more than three (3) pages, addressing the following topics, in separate paragraphs; as set forth herein. ( Status Conference set for 4/18/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 518, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Vernon S. Broderick.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 2/13/2014) (mro) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER: All motions are to be made returnable at 12:00 noon on Wednesday and in compliance with the rules of this Court. The parties are advised that this Court is participating in a pilot Program for initial discovery protocols for employment cases alleging adverse action. Adjournments of the dates set forth above will not be granted except for good cause and upon written application made as soon as the grounds for such application are known. Failure to comply with any of the provisions of this order will result in dismissal of the action, entry of a default judgment, or other appropriate sanction. (Fact Discovery due by 4/16/2014., Motions due by 5/7/2014., Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/7/2014.), ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/7/2014 at 04:00 PM before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 10/9/2013) (rsh) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          PRETRIAL ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 10/9/2013 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Plaintiff(s)' counsel ARE REQUIRED TO NOTIFY COUNSEL FOR ALL PARTIES OF THIS CONFERENCE. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 10/4/2013) (tn) Modified on 10/4/2013 (tn). (Entered: 10/04/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                            ANSWER to 7 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Michael R. Bloomberg(individually ), Michael R. Bloomberg(in his capacity as Mayor of the City of New York), The City of New York, The New York City Taxi & Limousine Commission, David Yassky(individually), David Yassky(in his capacity as Chairman of the New York City Taxi and Limousine Commission).(Ciappetta, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None
                                              FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Michael R. Bloomberg(individually ), Michael R. Bloomberg(in his capacity as Mayor of the City of New York), Does 1-9(individually ), Does 1-9(in their capacity as agents or employees of the City of New York), The City of New York, The New York City Taxi & Limousine Commission, David Yassky(individually), David Yassky(in his capacity as Chairman of the New York City Taxi and Limousine Commission).Document filed by Evgeny Freidman, Greater New York Taxi Association.(tro) Modified on 5/23/2013 (tro). (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Evgeny Freidman, Greater New York Taxi Association.(Mintz, Steven) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Terence William McCormick on behalf of Evgeny Freidman, Greater New York Taxi Association (McCormick, Terence) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Glen Mintz on behalf of Evgeny Freidman, Greater New York Taxi Association (Mintz, Steven) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      STIPULATION: IT IS THEREFORE STIPULATED AND AGREED that Plaintiffs may serve a First Amended Complaint on or before May 22, 2013. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that Defendants shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint on or before June 21, 2013. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that Defendants hereby consent pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2) to the Plaintiffs' filing a Second Amended Complaint, at their option, on or before July 12. 2013. (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan, Part I on 5/17/2013) (cd) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal served on Mintz & Gold, LLP on May 8, 2013. Service was accepted by Karen Martinez. Document filed by Michael R. Bloomberg(individually ), Michael R. Bloomberg(in his capacity as Mayor of the City of New York), The City of New York, The New York City Taxi & Limousine Commission, David Yassky(individually), David Yassky(in his capacity as Chairman of the New York City Taxi and Limousine Commission). (Ciappetta, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/09/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 153501-13. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401066856).Document filed by David Yassky(individually), The City of New York, Michael R. Bloomberg(individually ), Michael R. Bloomberg(in his capacity as Mayor of the City of New York), David Yassky(in his capacity as Chairman of the New York City Taxi and Limousine Commission), The New York City Taxi & Limousine Commission.(jom) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 240 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?