District Appellate Supreme
Federal
California Central District Court Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  1. Case No. 11-57187
    Filed 12/15/2011
  2. Case No. 14-56444
    Filed 9/4/2014
  3. Case No. 16-55977
    Filed 7/8/2016
United States Supreme Court

Courthouse News Service v. Michael Planet
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 11-57187

Tags
Last Updated September 28, 2016 at 6:28 AM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (46) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
MANDATE ISSUED.(JTN, KMW and MHM) Costs taxed against Appellee in the amount of $350.60. [9078139] (MT)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
    Filed (ECF) Appellant Courthouse News Service bill of costs (Form 10) in the amount of $350.60 USD. Date of service: 04/15/2014 [9058991] (REM)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      FILED OPINION (JOHN T. NOONAN, KIM MCLANE WARDLAW and MARY H. MURGUIA) REVERSED AND REMANDED. Judge: KMW Authoring, FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [9046053] (RP)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
        Filed order (JOHN T. NOONAN, KIM MCLANE WARDLAW and MARY H. MURGUIA) This case is submitted as of the date of this order. IT IS SO ORDERED. [9046052] (RP)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
          Filed (ECF) Appellant Courthouse News Service citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 01/02/2014. [8923063] (RRM)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
            Filed (ECF) Appellant Courthouse News Service citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 01/02/2014. [8923054] (RRM)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None
              Filed (ECF) Appellee Michael D. Planet citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 12/26/2013. [8916768] (RAN)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None
                Filed (ECF) Appellee Michael D. Planet citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 12/26/2013. [8916765] (RAN)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                  Filed (ECF) Appellant Courthouse News Service citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 12/20/2013. [8911283] (REM)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                    Filed (ECF) Appellant Courthouse News Service citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 07/12/2013. [8701984] (REM)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                      Filed (ECF) Appellee Michael D. Planet Correspondence: Update re AB 2073 Action by Judicial Council. Date of service: 07/08/2013 [8695086]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached certificate of service. Resent NDA. 07/09/2013 by RY] (RAN)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
                        Filed order MEDIATION (PWS): On May 30, 2013, a telephone conference was held with Circuit Mediator Peter W. Sherwood. Mediation efforts have been exhausted. Accordingly, this case is returned to the panel. [8651411] (BJB)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                          Filed order MEDIATION (PWS):Pursuant to this court's order, dated May 13, 2013, this appeal has been referred to the Mediation Program. See Fed. R. App. P. 33 and Ninth Cir. R. 33-1. The court has scheduled a telephone assessment conference, with counsel only, on May 30, 2013, at 3:00 p.m. Pacific Time to discuss whether this matter may be resolved with the assistance of a Circuit Mediator. [8636361] (KKW)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                            Filed order MEDIATION (PWS):Pursuant to this court's order, dated May 13, 2013, this immigration petition has been referred to the Mediation Program. See Fed. R. App. P. 33 and Ninth Cir. R. 33-1. The court has scheduled a telephone assessment conference, with counsel only, on May 30, 2013, at 3:00 p.m. Pacific Time to discuss whether this matter may be resolved with the assistance of a Circuit Mediator. [8635138] (KKW)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                              Filed order (JOHN T. NOONAN, KIM MCLANE WARDLAW and MARY H. MURGUIA) This appeal is referred to the Ninth Circuit Mediation Program to explore a possible resolution of the appeal through mediation. Submission is vacated until further order of this court. The mediator shall report to the court every thirty (30) days as to the status of the mediation. The mediation unit shall contact the parties directly to confer. IT IS SO ORDERED. [8626348] (KKW)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                                Filed order (JOHN T. NOONAN, KIM MCLANE WARDLAW and MARY H. MURGUIA) Courthouse News Service’s Request for Judicial Notice is GRANTED. See Fed. R. Evid. 201. IT IS SO ORDERED. [8618781] (WL)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                  Filed (ECF) Appellee Michael D. Planet citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 05/01/2013. [8612411]--[COURT UPDATE: Replaced PDF (to include cert of service), resent notice. 05/02/2013 by ASW] (RAN)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                    Filed Appellant Courthouse News Service additional citations. Served on 04/24/2013. (panel) [8605336] (MT)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                                      Filed (ECF) Appellant Courthouse News Service citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 04/24/2013. [8603693] (REM)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None
                                        Filed (ECF) Errata to Reply brief ([25] Brief Submitted for Review (ECF Filing) ). Filed by Appellant Courthouse News Service. Date of service: 04/05/2013. [8578423] (REM)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                                          Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Robert A. Naeve, Esquire for Appellee Michael D. Planet. [8540134] (RAN)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                                            Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Ms. Rachel Elizabeth Matteo-Boehm for Appellant Courthouse News Service. [8539932] (REM)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                                              Notice of Oral Argument on MAY Calendar. Please return ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF HEARING NOTICE form to: PASADENA Office. Please open attached documents to view details about your case. [8539634] (LN)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                Submitted (ECF) further excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Courthouse News Service. Date of service: 09/12/2012. [8511367] (REM)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                  Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Courthouse News Service. Date of service: 05/29/2012. [8511359] (REM)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                    Submitted (ECF) supplemental excerpts of record in 1 volume(s). Submitted by Appellee Michael D. Planet. Date of service: 07/30/2012. [8507396] (NG)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                      Sent Notice requesting electronic excerpts in 14 days. [8507080] (SS)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellant Courthouse News Service citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 11/06/2012. [8389450] (REM)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellee Michael D. Planet citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 10/31/2012. [8383028] (RAN)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                            Filed clerk order: The reply brief [25] submitted by Courthouse News Service is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8320979] (RH)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellant Courthouse News Service Motion to take judicial notice of. Date of service: 09/12/2012. [8320964] (REM)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                Submitted (ECF) Reply brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Courthouse News Service. Date of service: 09/12/2012. [8320937] (REM)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  Filed clerk order: The answering brief [21] submitted by Michael D. Planet is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8268393] (RH)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    Submitted (ECF) Answering brief for review. Submitted by Appellee Michael D. Planet. Date of service: 07/30/2012. [8267820] (NG)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LBS): The parties’ joint motion to extend the briefing schedule is granted. The answering brief is due July 30, 2012. The optional reply brief is due September 12, 2012. . [8220358] (KKW)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellee Michael D. Planet Joint Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 07/30/2012 at 11:59 pm. Date of service: 06/06/2012. [8204541] (NG)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [15] submitted by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8203970] (RH)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press. Date of service: 06/05/2012. [8203432] (LAD)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Roger R. Myers for Appellant Courthouse News Service. Date of service: 06/01/2012. [8199570] (RRM)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Nathaniel P. Garrett for Appellee Michael D. Planet. Date of service: 06/01/2012. [8198951] (NG)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  Filed clerk order: The opening brief [7] submitted by Courthouse News Service is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8198659] (RH)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Courthouse News Service. Date of service: 05/29/2012. [8193685]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. Resent NDA. 06/01/2012 by RY] (REM)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Court Reporter Ms. Blanca Aguilar Correspondence: Per counsel's request, copy two of TDO attached from Court Reporter T. Lanza.. Date of service: 01/11/2012 [8028471] (BC)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellant Courthouse News Service Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/19/2011. [8005217] (REM)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          Filed representation notice of Rachel Matteo-Boehm for Appellant. Served on 12/15/2011. [8002075] (BG)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Fee due from Appellant Courthouse News Service on 12/15/2011. Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/22/2011. Transcript ordered by 01/17/2012. Transcript due 04/16/2012. Appellant Courthouse News Service opening brief due 05/29/2012. Appellee Michael D. Planet answering brief due 06/28/2012. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [8002070] (BG)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                              This case has been viewed 15 times.

                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                              Space
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                               
                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                              Need Password Help?