Wetlands Action Network, et al., Petitioners v. United States Army Corps of Engineers, et al.
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 00-1692

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Wetlands Action Network, et al., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by TERRIS, PRAVLIK & MILLIAN, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce J. Terris +1 202 682 2100 +1 202 289 6795 bterris@tpmlaw.com
No Logo Playa Capital Company, L.L.C., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Dale Crockett +1 213 485 1234 +1 213 891 8763 bob@bobcrockettlaw.com
No Logo United States Army Corps of Engineers, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara D. Underwood
No Logo Sierra Club, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard R. Wiebe +1 415 433 3200 +1 415 433 6382 wiebe@pacbell.net
Status Decided
Lower Court Case No(s). 98-56242/56474/56672
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 10/1/2001, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 17 Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: None
    Application (A00-1064) denied by the Court.
      LREF
      Blank 16 Filed: 6/27/2001, Entered: None
      DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 24, 2001
        LREF
        Blank 15 Filed: 6/25/2001, Entered: None
        (A00-1064) Application scheduled for June 28, 2001 Conference, p.20.
          LREF
          Blank 14 Filed: 6/25/2001, Entered: None
          Application (A00-1064) referred to the Court by Justice Breyer.
            LREF
            Blank 13 Filed: 6/25/2001, Entered: None
            Reply brief of petitioners Wetlands Action Network, et al. filed.
              LREF
              Blank 12 Filed: 6/14/2001, Entered: None
              Application (A00-1064) refiled and submitted to Justice Breyer.
                LREF
                Blank 11 Filed: 6/13/2001, Entered: None
                Application (A00-1064) denied by Justice O'Connor.
                  LREF
                  Blank 10 Filed: 6/11/2001, Entered: None
                  Brief amici curiae of Sierra Club, et al. filed.
                    LREF
                    Blank 9 Filed: 6/11/2001, Entered: None
                    Brief of respondents United States Army Corps of Engineers, et al. in opposition filed.
                      LREF
                      Blank 8 Filed: 6/11/2001, Entered: None
                      Response to application (A00-1064) filed by federal respondents.
                        LREF
                        Blank 7 Filed: 6/11/2001, Entered: None
                        Brief of respondent Playa Capital Company, L.L.C. in opposition filed.
                          LREF
                          Blank 6 Filed: 6/11/2001, Entered: None
                          Response to application (A00-1064) filed by Playa Capital Company, LLC.
                            LREF
                            Blank 5 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: None
                            Response to application (A00-1064) from U.S. Army Corps of Engineers requested by Justice O'Connor, due June 11, 2001.
                              LREF
                              Blank 4 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: None
                              Application (A00-1064) for a stay of the mandate pending the disposition of the petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to Justice O'Connor.
                                LREF
                                Blank 3 Filed: 5/10/2001, Entered: None
                                Petition for writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 9, 2001)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 3/30/2001, Entered: None
                                  Application (A00-852) granted by Justice O'Connor extending the time to file until May 10, 2001.
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 3/30/2001, Entered: None
                                    Application (A00-852) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 10, 2001 to May 10, 2001, submitted to Justice O'Connor.
                                      LREF

                                      Space Space

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 152 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?