United States, Petitioner v. Navajo Nation
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 01-1375

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

United States of America United States of America, Petitioner
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by Solicitor General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore B. Olson +1 202 514 2217
No Logo Navajo Nation, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Rothstein, Donatelli, et al.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul E. Frye +1 505 243 1443
No Logo Jicarilla Apache Nation and Pueblo of Laguna, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by NORDHAUS, HALTOM, TAYLOR, TARADASH & BLADH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jill Elise Grant +1 202 530 1270 +1 202 530 1920 jgrant@nordhauslaw.com
No Logo Mississippi Band Of Choctaw Indians, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Hobbs, Straus, Dean & Walker, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Allen Hobbs +1 202 822 8282
No Logo National Congress Of American Indians, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey S Sutton +1 614 469 3855
No Logo Peabody Coal Company, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space V. Thomas Lankfrod +1 703 299 5000
Status Decided
Lower Court Case No(s). 00-5086
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 33 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: None
Record returned to U.S.C.A. for the Federal Circuit.
    LREF
    Blank 32 Filed: 4/3/2003, Entered: None
    JUDGMENT ISSUED.
      LREF
      Blank 31 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: None
      Adjudged to be REVERSED and REMANDED Ginsburg, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Rehnquist, C.J., and Scalia, Kennedy, Thomas, and Breyer, JJ., joined. Souter, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Stevens and O'Connor, JJ., joined.
        LREF
        Blank 30 Filed: 12/2/2002, Entered: None
        ARGUED.
          LREF
          Blank 29 Filed: 11/29/2002, Entered: None
          Record filed.
            LREF
            Blank 28 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: None
            Reply brief of petitioner United States filed.
              LREF
              Blank 27 Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: None
              CIRCULATED.
                LREF
                Blank 26 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: None
                Brief amicus curiae of National Congress of American Indians filed.
                  LREF
                  Blank 25 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: None
                  Brief amicus curiae of Mississippi Band of Choctaw Indians filed.
                    LREF
                    Blank 24 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: None
                    Brief amici curiae of Jicarilla Apache Nation and Pueblo of Laguna filed.
                      LREF
                      Blank 23 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: None
                      Brief of respondent Navajo Nation filed.
                        LREF
                        Blank 22 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: None
                        Motion of respondent Navajo Nation to strike amicus curiae Peabody Coal Company's lodging GRANTED.
                          LREF
                          Blank 21 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: None
                          Motion of Peabody Coal Company, et al. for leave to file a brief as amici curiae GRANTED.
                            LREF
                            Blank 20 Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: None
                            Navajo Nation reply to opposition to motion of Peabody filed.
                              LREF
                              Blank 19 Filed: 9/11/2002, Entered: None
                              Opposition of amici Peabody, et al. to motion of respondent to strike lodging filed.
                                LREF
                                Blank 18 Filed: 8/30/2002, Entered: None
                                Motion of respondent Navajo Nation to strike amicus curiae Peabody Coal Company's lodging filed.
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 17 Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: None
                                  Order extending time to file respondent's brief on the merits to and including October 9, 2002.
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 16 Filed: 8/22/2002, Entered: None
                                    LODGING consisting of twenty bound copies of related material submitted by counsel for amici Peabody, et al.
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 15 Filed: 8/19/2002, Entered: None
                                      Motion of Peabody Coal Company, et al. for leave to file a brief as amici curiae filed.
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 14 Filed: 8/19/2002, Entered: None
                                        Brief of petitioner United States filed.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 13 Filed: 8/19/2002, Entered: None
                                          *Joint appendix in two volumes
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 12 Filed: 8/19/2002, Entered: None
                                            Joint appendix filed.
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 11 Filed: 8/7/2002, Entered: None
                                              Order further extending time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits to and including August 19, 2002.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 10 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: None
                                                Order extending time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits to and including August 8, 2002.
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: None
                                                  Petition GRANTED. This case is set for oral argument in tandem with No. 01-1067, United States v. White Mountain Apache Tribe. SET FOR ARGUMENT December 2, 2002.
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: None
                                                    Reply brief of petitioner United States filed.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: None
                                                      DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 30, 2002
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: None
                                                        LODGING consisting of ten bound copies of related material submitted by counsel for the respondent.
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: None
                                                          Brief of respondent Navajo Nation in opposition filed.
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                            Order extending time to file response to petition until May 18, 2002.
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                              Petition for writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 18, 2002)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 2/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                Application (A01-577) granted by the Chief Justice extending the time to file until March 15, 2002.
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: None
                                                                  Application (A01-577) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 14, 2002 to March 16, 2002, submitted to The Chief Justice.
                                                                    LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 30 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?