James T. Hannon, Petitioner v. Department of Justice
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 01-372

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo James T. Hannon, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by KATOR, PARKS & WEISER, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Kator +1 202 898 4800 +1 202 289 1389 mkator@katorparks.com
Status Decided
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 99-3354
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 12 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 11 Filed: 12/6/2001, Entered: None
    Letter and attached opinion received from counsel for the petitioner and distributed.
      LREF
      Blank 10 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: None
      REDISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 7, 2001
        LREF
        Blank 9 Filed: 11/23/2001, Entered: None
        Reply brief of petitioners filed.
          LREF
          Blank 8 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: None
          DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 30, 2001
            LREF
            Blank 7 Filed: 10/31/2001, Entered: None
            Brief of respondent United States Department of Justice in opposition filed.
              LREF
              Blank 6 Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: None
              Order extending time to file response to petition until October 31, 2001.
                LREF
                Blank 5 Filed: 8/29/2001, Entered: None
                Petition for writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 31, 2001)
                  LREF
                  Blank 4 Filed: 7/20/2001, Entered: None
                  Application (A01-70) granted by the Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 29, 2001.
                    LREF
                    Blank 3 Filed: 7/20/2001, Entered: None
                    Application (A01-69) granted by the Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 29, 2001.
                      LREF
                      Blank 2 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: None
                      Application (A01-70) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 30, 2001 to August 29, 2001, submitted to The Chief Justice.
                        LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: None
                        Application (A01-69) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 30, 2001 to August 29, 2001, submitted to The Chief Justice.
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 9 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?