Abu-Ali Abdur'Rahman, Petitioner v. Ricky Bell, Warden
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 01-9094

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Deanne E. Maynard,

Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deanne E. Maynard +1 202 639 6000 +1 202 639 6066
No Logo Elizabeth G. Taylor,

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth G. Taylor +1 202 778 1800
No Logo Gene C. Schaerr,

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gene C. Schaerr +1 202 736 8000
No Logo Joseph F. Whalen,

Represented by Annmarie Marciarille

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph F. Whalen +1 615 532 7357
No Logo Kent S. Scheidegger,

Represented by Criminal Justice Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kent Stephen Scheidegger +1 916 446 0345 +1 916 446 1194 kent.scheidegger@cjlf.org
No Logo Thomas Goldstein,

Represented by Goldstein & Howe PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas C. Goldstein +1 202 237 7594
Status Decided
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 01-6487, 01-6504
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 42 Filed: 3/12/2003, Entered: None
Record returned to the USCA 6th Circuit.
    LREF
    Blank 41 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: None
    Record returned to the USDC Middle Dist. Tennessee.
      LREF
      Blank 40 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: None
      JUDGMENT ISSUED.
        LREF
        Blank 39 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: None
        Rehearing DENIED.
          LREF
          Blank 38 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: None
          DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 21, 2003
            LREF
            Blank 37 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: None
            Petition for rehearing filed.
              LREF
              Blank 36 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: None
              Writ of certiorari DISMISSED as improvidently granted. Opinion per curiam.
                LREF
                Blank 35 Filed: 11/6/2002, Entered: None
                ARGUED.
                  LREF
                  Blank 34 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: None
                  Supplemental brief of petitioner Abu-Ali Abdur'Rahman filed.
                    LREF
                    Blank 33 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: None
                    Supplemental brief of respondent Ricky Bell, Warden filed.
                      LREF
                      Blank 32 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: None
                      The parties are directed to file supplemental briefs addressing the following question: "Did the Sixth Circuit have jurisdiction to review the district court's order, dated November 27, 2001, transferring Petitioner's Rule 60(b) Motion to the Sixth Circuit pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1631? Does this Court have jurisdiction to review the Sixth Circuit's order, dated February 11, 2002, denying leave to file a second habeas corpus petition?" Briefs are to be filed with the Clerk and served upon opposing counsel on or before 3 p.m., Thursday, October 31, 2002. Twenty copies of the briefs prepared under Rule 33.2 may be filed initially in order to meet the October 31 filing date. Rule 29.2 does not apply. Forty copies of the briefs prepared under Rule 33.1 are to be filed as soon as possible thereafter.
                        LREF
                        Blank 31 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: None
                        Motion of respondent and Alabama, as amicus curiae, for divided argument and for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae GRANTED.
                          LREF
                          Blank 30 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: None
                          Reply brief of petitioner Abu-Ali Abdur'Rahman filed.
                            LREF
                            Blank 29 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: None
                            Motion for appointment of counsel GRANTED and it is ordered that Thomas C. Goldstein, Esquire, of Washington, D.C., is appointed to serve as counsel for the petitioner in this case.
                              LREF
                              Blank 28 Filed: 10/1/2002, Entered: None
                              Motion of respondent and Alabama, as amicus curiae, for divided argument and for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae filed.
                                LREF
                                Blank 27 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: None
                                Record filed.
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 26 Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: None
                                  Record filed.
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 25 Filed: 9/12/2002, Entered: None
                                    Brief amicus curiae of Criminal Justice Legal Foundation filed.
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 24 Filed: 9/12/2002, Entered: None
                                      Brief of respondent Ricky Bell, Warden filed.
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 23 Filed: 9/12/2002, Entered: None
                                        Brief amici curiae of Alabama, et al. filed.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 22 Filed: 9/11/2002, Entered: None
                                          Motion DISTRIBUTED. September 30, 2002 (Page 162)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 21 Filed: 8/31/2002, Entered: None
                                            CIRCULATED.
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 20 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: None
                                              Order extending time to file respondent's brief on the merits to and including September 12, 2002.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 19 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: None
                                                Motion of petitioner for appointment of counsel filed.
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: None
                                                  Brief of petitioner Abu-Ali Abdur'Rahman filed.
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: None
                                                    Joint appendix filed.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: None
                                                      Brief amici curiae of Former Prosecutors James F. Neal, et al. filed.
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: None
                                                        Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: None
                                                          Consent to the filing of all amicus briefs in support of either party received from counsel for the petitioner.
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                            Order further extending time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits to and including July 10, 2002.
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 5/16/2002, Entered: None
                                                              Order extending time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits to and including June 27, 2002.
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: None
                                                                Petition GRANTED. limited to Questions 1 and 2 presented by the petition. SET FOR ARGUMENT November 6, 2002.
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                  REDISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 19, 2002
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 4/8/2002, Entered: None
                                                                    REDISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 12, 2002
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 4/8/2002, Entered: None
                                                                      Application (A01-702) granted by the Court.
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 4/8/2002, Entered: None
                                                                        Application (A01-702) referred to the Court by Justice Stevens.
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 4/1/2002, Entered: None
                                                                          Supplemental brief of petitioner filed.
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 4/1/2002, Entered: None
                                                                            Reply brief of petitioner filed.
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 3/28/2002, Entered: None
                                                                              Response to application (A01-702) filed by Ricky Bell, Warden.
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 3/28/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                Brief of respondent in opposition filed.
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                  Petition for writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 18, 2002)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                    Application (A01-702) for a stay of execution pending the disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to Justice Stevens.
                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?