Jody Myesha Orso, Petitioner v. United States
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 01-9455

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Deanne E. Maynard,

Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deanne E. Maynard +1 202 639 6000 +1 202 639 6066
No Logo Elizabeth A. Newman,

Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth A Newman +1 213 894 2854 +1 213 894 0081 zzCAC_FPD_Document_Receiving@fd.org
No Logo Solicitor General,

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Solicitor General
Status Decided
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 99-50328
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 5 Filed: 6/20/2002, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 30, 2002
      LREF
      Blank 4 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: None
      Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
        LREF
        Blank 3 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: None
        Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
          LREF
          Blank 2 Filed: 5/2/2002, Entered: None
          Order extending time to file response to petition until June 5, 2002.
            LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 3/28/2002, Entered: None
            Petition for writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 5, 2002)
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 3 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?