Douglas M. Jackson, Sr., Petitioner v. Florida Department of Corrections
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 01-9518

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Douglas M. Jackson, Sr., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas M. Jackson +82 823 823 3916
v.
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert A. Butterworth +1 850 414 3600 +1 850 488 9314
Status Decided
Lower Court Supreme Court of Florida
Lower Court Case No(s). SC92827
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 3 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 2 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 6, 2002
      LREF
      Blank 1 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: None
      Petition for writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 9, 2002)
        LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 3 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?