Xu Liu and Xiaomei Yang, Petitioners v. Price Waterhouse LLP and Computer Language Research, Inc.
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 02-1213

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Xuliu, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by CITICORP CENTER, 500 WEST MADISON STREET

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dean A. Monco +1 380 380 3800
No Logo Xu Liu, et al., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Erik S. Jaffe +1 202 434 5334
PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP, Respondent
Officially listed as "Price Waterhouse LLP, et al."

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Landau +1 202 879 5087 +1 202 654 9532 clandau@kirkland.com
No Logo Comm.on Copyright and Literary Property of Bar of City of NY, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Reitler Kailas & Rosenblatt, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert William Clarida +1 212 790 9266 +1 212 575 0671 rclarida@reitlerlaw.com
No Logo Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Sachnoff & Weaver, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space E. Leonard Rubin +1 312 207 6464
No Logo Malla Pollack, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Univ. of Memphis,School of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Malla Pollack +1 901 678 1393
Status Decided
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 01-1744
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 13 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None
    Reply brief of petitioners Xu Liu, et al. filed.
      LREF
      Blank 12 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: None
      REDISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 26, 2003
        LREF
        Blank 11 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: None
        Brief of respondents Price Waterhouse LLP, et al. in opposition filed.
          LREF
          Blank 10 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: None
          Order extending time to file response to petition until June 2, 2003.
            LREF
            Blank 9 Filed: 4/8/2003, Entered: None
            Response requested. (Due May 8, 2003)
              LREF
              Blank 8 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: None
              DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 18, 2003
                LREF
                Blank 7 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: None
                Waiver of right of respondents Price Waterhouse LLP, et al. to respond filed.
                  LREF
                  Blank 6 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: None
                  Brief amicus curiae of Comm.on Copyright and Literary Property of Bar of City of NY filed.
                    LREF
                    Blank 5 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: None
                    Brief amici curiae of Malla Pollack, et al. filed.
                      LREF
                      Blank 4 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: None
                      Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Law Association of Chicago filed.
                        LREF
                        Blank 3 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: None
                        Petition for writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 2, 2003)
                          LREF
                          Blank 2 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: None
                          Application (A02-520) granted by Justice Stevens extending the time to file until February 14, 2003.
                            LREF
                            Blank 1 Filed: 10/19/2002, Entered: None
                            Application (A02-520) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 15, 2003 to February 14, 2003, submitted to Justice Stevens.
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 15 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?