William O. Schism and Robert L. Reinlie, Petitioners v. United States
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 02-1226

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo William O. Schism, et al., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George E. Day +1 850 243 1234
United States of America United States of America, Respondent
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Solicitor General
No Logo Disabled American Veterans, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by fr,com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Hieken +1 617 542 5070 heiken@fr,com
No Logo Military Officers Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by KATOR, PARKS & WEISER, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Kator +1 202 898 4800 +1 202 289 1389 mkator@katorparks.com
No Logo West Point Class of 1959, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Gabel Law firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael A. Gabel +1 404 288 0693
Status Decided
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 99-1402
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 12 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 11 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: None
    Motion of Mary Jane Schism Short for substitution as petitioner in place of William O. Schism, deceased GRANTED.
      LREF
      Blank 10 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: None
      Motion of Mary Jane Schism Short for substitution as petitioner in place of William O. Schism, deceased filed.
        LREF
        Blank 9 Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: None
        DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 29, 2003
          LREF
          Blank 8 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: None
          Reply brief of petitioners William O. Schism and Robert L. Reinlie filed.
            LREF
            Blank 7 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: None
            Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
              LREF
              Blank 6 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: None
              Brief amicus curiae of Military Officers Association of America filed.
                LREF
                Blank 5 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: None
                Order further extending time to file response to petition until May 2, 2003.
                  LREF
                  Blank 4 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: None
                  Brief amici curiae of Disabled American Veterans, et al. filed.
                    LREF
                    Blank 3 Filed: 3/26/2003, Entered: None
                    Brief amicus curiae of West Point Class of 1959 filed.
                      LREF
                      Blank 2 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: None
                      Order extending time to file response to petition until April 25, 2003.
                        LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: None
                        Petition for writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 2, 2003)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 19 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?