Barbara Grutter, Petitioner v. Lee Bollinger, et al.
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 02-241

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Barbara Grutter, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Maslon Edelman Borman & Brand LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kirk O. Kolbo +1 612 672 8200 +6728 672 672 8397 kirk.kolbo@maslon.com
No Logo Kimberly James, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leonard M. Niehoff +1 734 995 3110

Toggle Switch Represented by Scheff & Washington

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George B. Washington +1 313 963 1921
No Logo Lee Bollinger, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maureen E. Mahoney +1 202 637 2200 +1 202 637 2201 maureen.mahoney@lw.com
No Logo 13,922 Current Law Students at Accredited American Law Sch., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Georgetown University Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie R. O'sullivan +1 202 662 9394
No Logo 3M and other Leading Businesses, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David W. DeBruin +1 202 639 6015 +1 202 637 6375 ddebruin@jenner.com
No Logo AFL - CIO, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Service Employees International Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harold Craig Becker +1 312 236 4584 beckerc@seiu.org
No Logo Alabama, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of AG of Alabama

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John J. Park +1 334 242 7401
American Bar Association American Bar Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by American Bar Association

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space A. P. Carlson +1 312 988 2515
No Logo American Council on Education, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin Michaelson +1 202 637 5748
No Logo American Educational Research Association, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Angelo N. Ancheta +1 617 496 3240
No Logo American Jewish Committee, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stewart D. Aaron +1 212 415 9200
No Logo American Law Deans Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas Laycock +1 512 232 1341
No Logo American Psychological Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Shea & Gardner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul R. Friedman +1 202 828 2000
No Logo American Sociological Association, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bill Lann Lee +1 415 956 1000
No Logo Amherst, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles S. Sims +1 212 969 3000 +1 212 969 2900 csims@proskauer.com
No Logo Anti-defamation League, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Butzel Long, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin Edward Karlinsky +1 212 940 8800 +1 212 940 8806 karlinsky@butzel.com
No Logo Arizona State University College of Law, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by AZ State Univ. College of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Bender +1 480 965 2556
No Logo Asian American Legal Foundation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Girard Gibbs, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gordon M. Fauth +1 415 981 4800
No Logo Association of American Law Schools, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pamela Susan Karlan +1 650 725 4851 karlan@stanford.edu
No Logo Association of American Medical Colleges, et al. (TBP), Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert A. Burgoyne +1 202 662 4513 +1 202 662 4643 rburgoyne@fulbright.com
No Logo Banks Broadcasting, Inc. and Media Companies, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth G. Taylor +1 202 778 1800
No Logo Bay Mills Indian Community, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vanya S. Hogen +1 612 766 7000
No Logo Black Women Lawyers Association of Greater Chicago, Inc., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Black Women Lawyers Assn.Chica

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sharon E. Jones +1 312 554 2088
No Logo Boston Bar Association, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Dwyer & Collora

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas E. Dwyer, Jr. +1 617 371 1000 +1 617 371 1037 tdwyer@dwyercollora.com
No Logo Carnegie Mellon University, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space W. Thomas McGough, Jr. +2883 288 288 3088 tmcgough@reedsmith.com
No Logo CATO Institute, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by New York Univ School Of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samuel Estreicher +1 212 998 6226
No Logo Center for Advancement of Capitalism, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Reed Burton +1 703 521 3900 DRBargus@aol.com
No Logo Center for Equal Opportunity, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space C. Mark Pickrell +1 615 356 4978
No Logo Center for Individual Freedom, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Individual Freedom

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Renee L. Giachino +1 703 535 5836
No Logo Center for New Black Leadership, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clint Bolick +1 202 955 1300
No Logo City of Philadelphia, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Wiggin & Dana LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Victor A. Bolden +1 203 498 4400 +1 203 946 7942
No Logo Claremont Institute Center of Constitutional Jurisprudence, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Edwin Meese , III

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edwin Meese, III +1 202 633 2001
No Logo Clinical Legal Education Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy A. Nelsen +1 312 407 0700 +1 312 407 0700 tnelsen@skadden.com
No Logo Coalition for Economic Equity, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Univ. of Hawai'i Law School

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric K. Yamamoto +1 808 956 6548
No Logo Columbia University, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Floyd Abrams +1 212 701 3000 + 212 269 5420
No Logo Concerned Black Graduates of ABA Accredited Law Sch.,et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary Mack Adu +1 510 521 8626
No Logo Criminal Justice Legal Foundation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Criminal Justice Legal Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kent Stephen Scheidegger +1 916 446 0345 +1 916 446 1194 kent.scheidegger@cjlf.org
No Logo Equal Employment Advisory Council, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ann Elizabeth Reesman +1 202 789 8600
No Logo Florida, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL - GAINES ST

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Louis Frederick Hubener +1 850 414 3681 lou.hubener@myfloridalegal.com
General Motors Corporation General Motors Corporation, Other Party
Unknown Role, General Motors Co
Unknown Role, Panamsat Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth S. Geller +1 202 263 3000 +1 202 263 3300 kgeller@mayerbrown.com
No Logo Graduate Management Admission Council, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen M. McNabb +1 202 662 4528 +1 202 662 4643 Stephen.mcnabb@nortonrosefulbright.com
No Logo Harvard Black Law Students Association, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THEODORE V. WELLS +1 212 373 3089 +1 212 492 0089 twells@paulweiss.com
No Logo Harvard University, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by President and Fellows of Harvard College

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laurence H. Tribe +1 617 495 4621 larry@tribelaw.com
No Logo Hayden Family, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Murell & Brown

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roy C. Howell +1 202 742 2000
No Logo Hillary Browne, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Howard University School Of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Alan Berry +1 202 806 8000
No Logo Hispanic National Bar Association, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Willamette University College Of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gilbert Paul Carrasco +1 503 370 6132
No Logo Howard University, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Janell M. Byrd +1 202 312 0708
No Logo Human Rights Advocates and Univ.of MN Human Rights Center, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Constance De La +1 415 422 6752
No Logo Indiana University, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Franklin Fitzpatrick +1 202 942 5878 +1 202 942 5560
No Logo Jennifer M. Granholm, Governor of Michigan, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Honigman Miller Schwartz & Cohn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John D. Pirich +1 517 377 0710 +1 517 377 0723 jpirich@honigman.com
No Logo John Conyers, Jr., et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Preston Gates & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Miles +1 206 623 7580
No Logo Judith Areen, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by GEORGETOWN LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Neal Katyal +1 202 662 9000 katyaln@law.georgetown.edu
No Logo King County Bar Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Warner Widell +1 206 713 1490 widellappellate@msn.com
No Logo Latino Organizations, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Mexican American Legal Defense & Education Fund

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Antonia Hernandez +1 213 629 2512
No Logo Law Professors, Larry Alexander, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Erik S. Jaffe +1 202 434 5334
No Logo Law School Admission Council, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Walter Dellinger +1 202 383 5300
No Logo Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John S. Skilton +1 608 663 7470 +1 202 912 2020 john.skilton@hellerehrman.com
No Logo Leadership Conference on Civil Rights, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Neil Weiner +1 202 942 5855 +1 202 942 5999 robert.weiner@aporter.com
No Logo Lt. Gen. Julius W. Becton, Jr., et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Virginia A. Seitz +1 202 736 8000
No Logo Maryland, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Solicitor General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Caitlin J. Halligan +1 518 473 6085
No Logo Massachusetts Institute of Technology, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica K. Lowe +1 202 879 3939
No Logo Massachusetts School of Law, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Massachusetts School of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence Robert Velvel +1 978 681 0800 +1 978 681 6330 velvel@mslaw.edu
No Logo Members and Former Members of PA General Assembly, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by PA House of Representatives

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark B. Cohen +1 717 787 4117
No Logo Michigan Association of Scholars, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Mohrman & Kaardal

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William F. Morhman +1 612 341 1074
No Logo Michigan Black Law Alumni Society, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Harris Wiltshire Grannis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher J. Wright +1 202 730 1300
No Logo NAACP Legal Defense And Educational Fund, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elise C. Boddie +1 212 965 2200 +1 212 226 7592
No Logo National Association of Scholars, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Keith Noreika +1 202 662 6000 +1 202 778 5497 knoreika@cov.com
No Logo National Center for Fair & Open Testing, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Advocates Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Thomas Affeldt +1 415 431 7430 +1 415 431 1048 jaffeldt@publicadvocates.org
No Logo National Education Association, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert H. Chanin +1 202 842 2600
No Logo National School Boards Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by National School Boards Association

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie Underwood +1 703 838 6722
No Logo National Urban League, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William A. Norris +1 310 229 1000
No Logo Natl. Coalition of Blacks for Reparations in America, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by WV Univ. College of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Outterson +1 304 293 8282
No Logo New America Alliance, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Mellon Financial Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS R JULIN +1 305 810 2516 +1 305 810 1601 tjulin@hunton.com
No Logo New Jersey, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by R.j. Hughes Justice Complex

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Burstein +1 609 292 4925
No Logo New Mexico Hispanic Bar Association, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward Benavidez +1 505 831 5293
No Logo New York City Council Speaker A. Gifford Miller, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Columbia University School Of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jack Greenberg +1 212 854 8030
No Logo New York State Black and Puerto Rican Legislative Caucus, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Cuny Law School

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Victor Goode +1 718 340 4310
No Logo NOW Legal Defense and Eduation Fund, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by nowldef.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wendy R. Weiser +1 212 925 6635 +1 212 226 1066 wweiser@nowldef.org
No Logo Pacific Legal Foundation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John H. Findley +1 916 362 2833
No Logo Richard A. Gephardt and Congressional, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary L. Smith +1 202 371 7000
No Logo School of Law, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by University Of North Carolina

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Charles Boger +1 919 843 9288
No Logo Senators Thomas Daschle, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by DONAHUE & GOLDBERG, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Thomas Goldberg +1 212 334 8813 david@donahuegoldberg.com
No Logo Social Scientists Glenn Loury, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Fred Liss +1 202 861 3940
No Logo Society of American Law Teachers, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Selmi +1 617 573 8776
No Logo The United States, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Solicitor General
No Logo Environmental Law Clinic, Other Party
Officially listed as "UCLA School of Law"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sonia Mercado +1 310 410 2981
No Logo United Negro College Fund and Kappa Alpha PSI, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Drew S. Days +1 202 887 1500 DDays@mofo.com
No Logo Univ.of Michigan Asian Pacific American Law Students, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerome S. Hirsch +1 212 735 3000 +1 917 777 2530 JHirsch@Skadden.com
No Logo University of Pittsburgh, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David C. Frederick +1 202 326 7900 +1 202 326 7999 dfrederick@khhte.com
No Logo Veterans of the Southern Civil Rights Movement, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mitchell Harris Zimmerman +1 650 494 0600 +1 650 494 1417 mzimmerman@fenwick.com
No Logo Ward Connerly, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by th Fl.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Manuel S. Klausner +1 213 617 0414
BP America, Inc. BP America, Inc., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)
Officially listed as "BP America Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by BP America, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey S. Heller +1 713 366 5953
No Logo MTV Networks out of time, Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Buscemi +1 202 739 5190 +1 202 739 3001 pbuscemi@morganlewis.com
No Logo National Asian Pacific American Legal Consortium, et al., Amicus Curiae (In Support of Neither Party)

Toggle Switch Represented by Gilbert Randolph

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark A. Packman - PHV +1 202 772 2320 +1 202 772 2322 packmanm@gotofirm.com
Status Decided
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 01-1447/1516
  Entries (135) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 135 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: None
Adjudged to be AFFIRMED. O'Connor, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Stevens, Souter, Ginsburg, and Breyer, JJ.,joined, and in which Scalia and Thomas, JJ., joined in part insofar as it is consistent with the views expressed in Part VII of the opinion of Thomas, J. Ginsburg, J., filed a concurring opinion, in which Breyer, J., joined. Scalia, J., filed an opinion concurring in part and dissenting in part, in which Thomas, J., joined. Thomas, J., filed an opinion concurring in part and dissenting in part, in which Scalia, J., joined as to Parts I-VII. Rehnquist, C. J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Scalia, Kennedy, and Thomas, JJ., joined. Kennedy, J., filed a dissenting opinion.
    LREF
    Blank 134 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: None
    Motion of MTV Networks for leave to file a brief as amicus curiae out of time DENIED.
      LREF
      Blank 133 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: None
      Motion of BP America Incorporated for leave to file a brief as amicus curiae out of time DENIED.
        LREF
        Blank 132 Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: None
        ARGUED.
          LREF
          Blank 131 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: None
          Motion of MTV Networks for leave to file a brief as amicus curiae out of time filed.
            LREF
            Blank 130 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: None
            Record filed.
              LREF
              Blank 129 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: None
              Letter from counsel for the petitioner received and distributed.
                LREF
                Blank 128 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: None
                Reply brief of petitioner Barbara Grutter filed.
                  LREF
                  Blank 127 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: None
                  Record filed.
                    LREF
                    Blank 126 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: None
                    Motion of BP America Incorporated for leave to file a brief as amicus curiae out of time filed.
                      LREF
                      Blank 125 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: None
                      Motion of respondents Kimberly James, et al. for enlargement of argument time and for divided argument, or in the alternative, for divided argument DENIED.
                        LREF
                        Blank 124 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: None
                        Motion of Exxon Mobil Corporation for leave to file a brief as amicus curiae GRANTED.
                          LREF
                          Blank 123 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: None
                          Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
                            LREF
                            Blank 122 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: None
                            Response of Bollinger, et al. to motion of James, et al. for enlargement of argument time and divided argument,or in the alternative, for divided argument.
                              LREF
                              Blank 121 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: None
                              Motion of respondents Kimberly James, et al. for enlargement of argument time and for divided argument, or in the alternative, for divided argument filed.
                                LREF
                                Blank 120 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: None
                                Motion of Exxon Mobil Corporation for leave to file a brief as amicus curiae filed.
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 119 Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: None
                                  LODGING consisting of twenty bound copies of National Statistic Report received from counsel for amicus Law School Admission Council and distributed.
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 118 Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: None
                                    Brief of respondents Kimberly James, et al. filed.
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 117 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: None
                                      LODGING consisting of twenty bound copies of exhibits received from counsel for amici Natl. Asian Pacific American Legal Fdtn, et al.and distributed. VIDED.
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 116 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None
                                        Brief amicus curiae of Society of American Law Teachers filed.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 115 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None
                                          Brief amici curiae of NOW Legal Defense and Eduation Fund, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 114 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None
                                            Brief amici curiae of Concerned Black Graduates of ABA Accredited Law Sch.,et al. filed.
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 113 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None
                                              Brief amicus curiae of New York State Black and Puerto Rican Legislative Caucus filed.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 112 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                Brief amicus curiae of National Center for Fair & Open Testing filed.
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 111 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                  Brief amici curiae of Judith Areen, et al. filed.
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 110 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                    Brief amici curiae of Senators Thomas Daschle, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 109 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                      Brief amici curiae of Maryland, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 108 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                        Brief amicus curiae of AFL-CIO filed. VIDED.
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 107 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                          Brief amici curiae of Lt. Gen. Julius W. Becton, Jr., et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 106 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                            Brief amicus curiae of National School Boards Association filed. VIDED.
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 105 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                              Brief amici curiae of Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, et al. filed.
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 104 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed.
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 103 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                  Brief amici curiae of New Mexico Hispanic Bar Association, et al. filed.
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 102 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of American Law Deans Association filed.
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 101 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                      Brief amici curiae of University.of MI Asian Pacific American Law Students, et al. filed.
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 100 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                        Brief amicus curiae of Indiana University filed.
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 99 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                          Brief amici curiae of Leadership Conference on Civil Rights, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 98 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                            Brief amici curiae of New York City Council Speaker A. Gifford Miller, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 97 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                              Brief amici curiae of Latino Organizations filed.
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 96 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                Brief amici curiae of Banks Broadcasting, Inc. and Media Companies filed. VIDED.
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 95 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                  Brief amicus curiae of Black Women Lawyers Association of Greater Chicago, Inc. filed. VIDED.
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 94 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of UCLA School of Law Students of Color filed.
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 93 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                      Brief amicus curiae of Veterans of the Southern Civil Rights Movement, et al. filed.
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 92 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                        Brief amicus curiae of Clinical Legal Education Association filed.
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 91 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                          Brief amici curiae of American Educational Research Association, et al. filed.
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 90 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                            Brief amici curiae of City of Philadelphia, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 89 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                              Brief amici curiae of National Education Association, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 88 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                Brief amici curiae of 13,922 Current Law Students at Accredited American Law Sch. filed.
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 87 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Brief amici curiae of Harvard University, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 86 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Brief amici curiae of National Urban League, et al. filed.
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 85 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                      3 Brief amicus curiae of New America Alliance filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 84 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Brief amicus curiae of American Psychological Association filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 83 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Brief amici curiae of 3M and other Leading Businesses filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 82 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Brief amici curiae of United Negro College Fund and Kappa Alpha PSI filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 81 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Brief amicus curiae of King County Bar Association filed.
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 80 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Brief amicus curiae of General Motors Corporation filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 79 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Brief amici curiae of Social Scientists Glenn Loury, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 78 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Brief amici curiae of University of Pittsburgh, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 77 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Brief amici curiae of John Conyers, Jr., et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 76 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Brief amicus curiae of Arizona State University College of Law filed.
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 75 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Brief amici curiae of Bay Mills Indian Community, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 74 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Brief amici curiae of American Sociological Association, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 73 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Brief amicus curiae of Law School Admission Council filed.
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 72 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Brief amici curiae of Coalition for Economic Equity, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 71 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Brief amici curiae of Harvard Black Law Students Association, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 70 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Brief amici curiae of Hispanic National Bar Association, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 69 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Brief amici curiae of Massachusetts Institute of Technology, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 68 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Brief amicus curiae of Howard University filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 67 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Brief amici curiae of Boston Bar Association, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 66 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Brief of respondents Lee Bollinger, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 65 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Brief amici curiae of National Asian Pacific American Legal Consortium, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 64 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Brief amici curiae of American Jewish Committee, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 63 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Brief amicus curiae of Michigan Black Law Alumni Society filed.
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 62 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Brief amici curiae of Amherst, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 61 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Brief amicus curiae of Natl. Coalition of Blacks for Reparations in America, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 60 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Brief amici curiae of Carnegie Mellon University, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 59 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Brief amicus curiae of Jennifer M. Granholm, Governor of Michigan filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 58 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Brief amici curiae of Human Rights Advocates and Univ.of MN Human Rights Center filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 57 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Brief amicus curiae of New Jersey filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Brief amicus curiae of Association of American Law Schools filed.
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Brief amici curiae of American Council on Education, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Brief amici curiae of NAACP Legal Defense And Educational Fund, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Brief amici curiae of Members and Former Members of PA General Assembly, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Brief amici curiae of Graduate Management Admission Council, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Brief amici curiae of Association of American Medical Colleges, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 50 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Order extending time to file respondents Kimberly James, et al. brief on the merits to and including February 21, 2003.
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 49 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Brief amici curiae of Richard A. Gephardt and Congressional members filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 48 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Brief amici curiae of Columbia University, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Brief amicus curiae of School of Law of University of North Carolina filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 46 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Brief amici curiae of Hillary Browne, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 45 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 12/31/1969, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        3 Record filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 43 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Brief amicus curiae of Hayden Family filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 42 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            CIRCULATED.
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 41 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Brief amici curiae of Florida, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Brief amicus curiae of Massachusetts School of Law filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Brief amicus curiae of Center for Advancement of Capitalism filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of Michigan Association of Scholars filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Brief amicus curiae of Criminal Justice Legal Fdtn. in support of neither party filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Brief amicus curiae of Ward Connerly filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Brief amicus curiae of Reason Foundation filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Brief amicus curiae of Center for Individual Freedom filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Brief amicus curiae of Asian American Legal Foundation filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 32 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Brief amici curiae of Law Professors, Larry Alexander, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Brief amici curiae of Center for Equal Opportunity, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Brief of petitioner Barbara Grutter filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        * Joint appendix in two volumes.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint appendix filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Brief amicus curiae of Equal Employment Advisory Council filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Brief amicus curiae of Anti-Defamation League filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Brief amicus curiae of Claremont Institute Center of Constitutional Jurisprudence filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Scholars filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Brief amicus curiae of Center for New Black Leadership filed. VIDED.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent to the filing of amicus briefs in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioner Barbara Grutter.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Consent to the filing of amicus briefs in support of either party received from counsel for respondents Kimberly James, et al.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Consent to the filing of amicus briefs in support of either party received from counsel for University of Michigan respondents, Bollinger,Lehman, Shields, and Bd.of Regents.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 12/2/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Petition GRANTED. SET FOR ARGUMENT April 1, 2003.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 27, 2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reply brief of petitioner Barbara Grutter filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Brief amici curiae of Alabama, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Brief of respondents Lee Bollinger, et al. in opposition filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Brief amici curiae of Center for Equal Opportunity, et al. filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Brief amicus curiae of Claremont Institute Center of Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Brief of respondents Kimberly James, et al. in opposition filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This extension is granted for all respondents.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order further extending time to file response to petition until October 29, 2002.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 9/26/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 9/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent to the filing of amicus briefs in support of either party or neither party received from counsel for the respondents.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 9/6/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This extension of time is granted for all respondents.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 9/6/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order extending time to file response to petition until October 15, 2002.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 8/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appendix of petitioner filed.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 8/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Petition for writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 29, 2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 237 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?