Glenn C. Smith, Petitioner v. Immigration and Naturalization Service
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 02-9830

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Glenn C. Smith, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by #880144

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Glenn C. Smith
v.
No Logo Immigration & Naturalization Service, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Solicitor General
Status Decided
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 02-14247
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 4 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 3 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 15, 2003
      LREF
      Blank 2 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: None
      Waiver of right of respondent Immigration and Naturalization Service to respond filed.
        LREF
        Blank 1 Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: None
        Petition for writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 27, 2003)
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 12 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?