Tosin Adegbuji, Petitioner v. Immigration and Naturalization Service
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 03-10657

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tosin Adegbuji, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Etowah County Detention Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tosin Adegbuji +1 839 839 3922
v.
No Logo Immigration & Naturalization Service, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore B. Olson - PHV +1 202 955 8200 +1 202 530 9575 tolson@gibsondunn.com
Related Case 03A784
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 03-1902
Lower Court Decision Date 12/23/2003
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 5 Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 24, 2004.
      LREF
      Blank 4 Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: None
      Waiver of right of respondent Immigration and Naturalization Service to respond filed.
        LREF
        Blank 3 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: None
        Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 2, 2004)
          LREF
          Blank 2 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: None
          Application (03A784) granted by Justice Souter extending the time to file until May 21, 2004.
            LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: None
            Application (03A784) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 22, 2004 to May 21, 2004, submitted to Justice Souter.
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 10 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?