Cathy Cox, Georgia Secretary of State, Appellant v. Sara Larios, et al.
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 03-1413

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Cathy Cox, Georgia Secretary of State, Appellant, Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Allan Leroy Parks , Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David F. Walbert +1 404 873 8000 +1 404 873 8050 dwalbert@pcwlawfirm.com
No Logo Democratic Legislative Campaign Committee, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan D. Hacker +1 202 383 5300 +1 202 383 5414 jhacker@omm.com
No Logo Sara Larios, et al., Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank B. Strickland +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 fbs@sbllaw.net
Lower Court United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Lower Court Case No(s). 1:03-CV-693-CAP
Lower Court Decision Date 2/10/2004
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 10 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: None
JUDGMENT ISSUED.
    LREF
    Blank 9 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: None
    Adjudged to be AFFIRMED Justice Stevens filed a concurring opinion joined by Justice Breyer. Justice Scalia filed a dissenting opinion. (Detached Opinion)
      LREF
      Blank 8 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: None
      DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 29, 2004.
        LREF
        Blank 7 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: None
        DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 24, 2004.
          LREF
          Blank 6 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: None
          DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 17, 2004.
            LREF
            Blank 5 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: None
            Reply brief opposing motion to affirm by Appellate filed. (Distributed)
              LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 5/25/2004, Entered: None
              DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 10, 2004.
                LREF
                Blank 3 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: None
                Brief amici curiae of Democratic Legislative Campaign Committee, et al. filed.
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: None
                  Motion to affirm filed by appellees Sara Larios, et al.
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: None
                    Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due May 13, 2004)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 26 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?