Susan Moran, et al., Petitioners v. J. Elliott Hibbs, Director, Arizona Department of Revenue, et al.
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 03-1495

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Susan Moran, et al., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by KATOR, PARKS & WEISER, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Kator +1 202 898 4800 +1 202 289 1389 mkator@katorparks.com
v.
No Logo J. Elliott Hibbs, Director, Arizona Department of Revenue, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Arizona Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paula S Bickett +1 602 542 8304 +1 602 542 8308 paula.bickett@azag.gov
Lower Court Supreme Court of Arizona
Lower Court Case No(s). CV-03-0110-PR
Lower Court Decision Date 2/13/2004
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 5 Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: None
    Reply of petitioners Susan Moran, et al. filed. (Distributed)
      LREF
      Blank 4 Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: None
      DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 27, 2004.
        LREF
        Blank 3 Filed: 7/5/2004, Entered: None
        Brief of respondents J. Elliott Hibbs, Director, Arizona Department of Revenue, et al. in opposition filed.
          LREF
          Blank 2 Filed: 5/25/2004, Entered: None
          Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 2, 2004.
            LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: None
            Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 3, 2004)
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 24 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?