John Bariuan Maddela, Petitioner v. Immigration and Naturalization Service
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 03-6889

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John Maddela, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Maddela 1 +1 +1 +1
v.
No Logo Immigration & Naturalization Service, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore B. Olson - PHV +1 202 955 8200 +1 202 530 9575 tolson@gibsondunn.com
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 02-70702
Lower Court Decision Date 5/6/2003
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 4 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 3 Filed: 11/20/2003, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 5, 2003.
      LREF
      Blank 2 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: None
      Waiver of right of respondent Immigration and Naturalization Service to respond filed.
        LREF
        Blank 1 Filed: 10/10/2003, Entered: None
        Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 17, 2003)
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 9 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?