Jacob Blaz, Petitioner v. Robert A. Belfer, et al.
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 04-123

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jacob Blaz, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space KATHARINE M. RYAN +1 610 667 7706 +1 484 450 2582
v.
No Logo Andrew Fastow, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Smyser Kaplan & Veselka LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Craig Smyser +1 713 221 2330 +1 713 221 2320 csmyser@skv.com
No Logo Arthur Anderson Llp, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Miles N. Ruthberg +1 213 485 1234 +1 213 891 8763
No Logo John A. Urquhart, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space H. Bruce +1 713 223 2600
Lay, Kenneth L Lay, Kenneth L, Respondent
Officially listed as "Kenneth L. Lay"

Toggle Switch Represented by Carrington, Coleman, Sloman & Blumenthal, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James E Coleman, Jr. +1 214 855 3000 + 214 855 1333 jcoleman@ccsb.com
No Logo Robert A. Belfer, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibbs & Bruns, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin C Gibbs +1 713 650 8805 +1 713 750 0903 rgibbs@gibbs-bruns.com
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 03-20575
Lower Court Decision Date 4/22/2004
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 7 Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 27, 2004.
      LREF
      Blank 6 Filed: 8/25/2004, Entered: None
      Waiver of right of respondent Arthur Anderson LLP to respond filed.
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: None
        Waiver of right of respondent John A. Urquhart to respond filed.
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: None
          Waiver of right of respondents Robert A. Belfer, et al. to respond filed.
            LREF
            Blank 3 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: None
            Waiver of right of respondent Andrew Fastow to respond filed.
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: None
              Waiver of right of respondent Kenneth L. Lay to respond filed.
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: None
                Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 25, 2004)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 34 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?