Vide 04-1203
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 04-1236

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tony Goodman, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Drew S. Days +1 202 887 1500 DDays@mofo.com
United States of America United States of America, Petitioner
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D. Clement +1 202 514 2217
No Logo Georgia, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by General Litigation Division

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David E. Langford +1 404 463 8850

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Andrew Castanias +1 202 879 3939 +1 202 626 1700 gcastanias@jonesday.com
No Logo American Academy of Psychiatry and the Law, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6000 +1 202 639 6006
No Logo American Association on Mental Retardation, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James W. +1 505 277 2146
American Bar Association American Bar Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by American Bar Association

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert J. Grey +1 312 988 5000
No Logo Dick Thornburgh and National Organization, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley Stuart Phillips +1 213 683 9100 +1 213 687 3702 brad.phillips@mto.com
Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Other Party
Officially listed as "Former President George H.W. Bush"

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan Stephen Hut +1 202 663 6000
No Logo Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law. et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles T. Lester, Jr. +8597 859 838 4294 +1 859 486 6590 cteljr@yahoo.com
No Logo National Disability Rights Network, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathleen A. Behan +1 202 942 5000
No Logo Paralyzed Veterans of America, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerrold Joseph Ganzfried +1 202 469 5151 jerrold.ganzfried@hklaw.com
No Logo Tennessee, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gene Schaerr +1 202 282 5845 +1 202 282 5100 gschaerr@winston.com
Related Case 05A299
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 02-10168
Lower Court Decision Date 9/16/2004
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 37 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: None
Acknowledgement of receipt (02/14/06) of judgment from Clerk, United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit received.
    LREF
    Blank 36 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: None
    JUDGMENT ISSUED.
      LREF
      Blank 35 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: None
      Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED Scalia, J., delivered the opinion for a unanimous Court. Stevens, J., filed a concurring opinion, in which Ginsburg, J., joined.
        LREF
        Blank 34 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: None
        Argued. For petitioner in No. 04-1203: Paul D. Clement, Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D.C. For petitioner in No. 04-1236: Samuel R. Bagenstos, St. Louise, Mo. For respondents: Gregory A. Castanias, Washington, D.C.; and Gene C. Schaerr, Washington, D.C. (for Tennessee, et al., as amici curiae.)
          LREF
          Blank 33 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: None
          Reply of petitioner Tony Goodman filed. (Distributed)
            LREF
            Blank 32 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: None
            Reply of petitioner United States petitioner in 04-1203 filed. VIDED. (Distributed).
              LREF
              Blank 31 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: None
              Motion of Tennessee, et al. for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
                LREF
                Blank 30 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: None
                Application (05A299) to file petitioner's reply brief on the merits in excess of page limits granted by Justice Kennedy provided that the document does not exceed 30 pages.
                  LREF
                  Blank 29 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: None
                  Motion of the Solicitor General for divided argument GRANTED.
                    LREF
                    Blank 28 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: None
                    Motion of Tennessee, et al. for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                      LREF
                      Blank 27 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: None
                      Application (05A299) to file petitioner's reply brief on the merits in excess of page limits, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
                        LREF
                        Blank 26 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: None
                        Record received from U.S.D.C. for Southern Dist. of Georgia. (1 box)
                          LREF
                          Blank 25 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None
                          Motion of the Solicitor General for divided argument filed. VIDED.
                            LREF
                            Blank 24 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: None
                            Record received from U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit. (1 envelope)
                              LREF
                              Blank 23 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: None
                              Brief amici curiae of Tennessee, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed).
                                LREF
                                Blank 22 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: None
                                Brief of respondents Georgia, et al. filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 21 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None
                                  Brief amici curiae of Paralyzed Veterans of America, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 20 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None
                                    Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed. VIDED.
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 19 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None
                                      Brief amici curiae of Dick Thornburgh and National Organization filed. VIDED.
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 18 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None
                                        Brief amicus curiae of Former President George H.W. Bush filed. VIDED.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 17 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None
                                          Brief amici curiae of American Association on Mental Retardation, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 16 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None
                                            Brief of petitioner Tony Goodman filed.
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 15 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None
                                              Brief amici curiae of Lawyers's Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 14 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                Brief amicus curiae of National Disability Rights Network filed. VIDED.
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                  Brief amici curiae of ADAPT, American Academy of Psychiatry and the Law, et al. filed. VIDED.
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                    Brief of petitioner United States as petitioner in No. 04-1203 filed. VIDED.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                      Joint appendix filed. VIDED.
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 7/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                        Extension of time within which to file respondent's brief on the merits to and including September 22, 2005.
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                          SET FOR ARGUMENT on November 9, 2005.
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                            Order extending time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits to and including July 29, 2005. VIDED.
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                              Petition GRANTED. The case is consolidated with No. 04-1203 and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument.
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 12, 2005.
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                  DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 12, 2005.
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                    Reply of petitioner Tony Goodman filed. (Distributed)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                      Brief of respondents Georgia, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                        Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 15, 2005.
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                          Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 15, 2005)
                                                                            LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 105 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?