United States v. Hector Penaranda and Luis Rojas
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 04-59

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
SpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Hector Penaranda, Other Party

Represented by Alvy & Jacobson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Monica R. Jacobson +1 212 227 1219
No Logo Luis Rojas, Other Party

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward David Wilford +1 212 528 2741 +1 212 964 2926 edwardwilford@aol.com
United States of America United States of America, Other Party
Officially listed as "United States"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D. Clement +1 202 514 2217
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 03-1055 (L), 03-1062 (L
Lower Court Decision Date 7/12/2004
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: None
Record returned to U.S.C.A. - Second Circuit.
    LREF
    Blank 4 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: None
    The questions certified by the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit are dismissed.
      LREF
      Blank 3 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: None
      DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 21, 2005.
        LREF
        Blank 2 Filed: 7/15/2004, Entered: None
        Record received from U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit. (1 box)
          LREF
          Blank 1 Filed: 7/13/2004, Entered: None
          Certified questions filed.
            LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 500 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?