Ronald Cleveland Mooney, Petitioner v. Georgia
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 04-8847

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Ronald Cleveland Mooney, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by McIntyre & Associates - ATL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Kennedy +1 404 879 1515 mkm@georgiapostconviction.com
Related Case 04A564
Lower Court Court of Appeals of Georgia
Lower Court Case No(s). A03A2462
Lower Court Decision Date 3/25/2004
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 4 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 29, 2005.
      LREF
      Blank 3 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: None
      Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 30, 2005)
        LREF
        Blank 2 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: None
        Application (04A564) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until February 25, 2005.
          LREF
          Blank 1 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: None
          Application (04A564) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 10, 2005 to March 11, 2005, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
            LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 2 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?