Vic Fedorov, Petitioner v. Michael Bloomberg, Mayor of the City of New York
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 05-1262

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Vic Fedorov, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vic Fedorov +1 609 921 6561
v.
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Respondent
Officially listed as "Michael Bloomberg, Mayor of the City of New York"

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Department Of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen J. McGrath +1 212 788 1056
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 05-0298
Lower Court Decision Date 9/15/2005
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 4 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 3 Filed: 4/18/2006, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 11, 2006.
      LREF
      Blank 2 Filed: 4/5/2006, Entered: None
      Waiver of right of respondent Michael Bloomberg, Mayor of the City of New York to respond filed.
        LREF
        Blank 1 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: None
        Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 4, 2006)
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 2 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?