Grosshandels-und Lagerei-Berufsgenossenschaft, et al., Petitioners v. World Trade Center Properties, LLC, et al.
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 05-1315

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Grosshandels-und Lagerei-Berufsgenossenschaft, et al., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by McCallion & Associates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Foard McCallion +1 646 366 0880 +1 646 366 1384 kfm@mccallion-law.com
v.
No Logo AMR Corporation, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
No Logo Argenbright Security, Inc., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles E. Koob +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 ckoob@stblaw.com
The Boeing Company, Inc. The Boeing Company, Inc., Respondent
Officially listed as "Boeing Company"

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Jeffrey McLaughlin +1 206 359 8483 +1 206 359 9483 tmclaughlin@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Burns International Security Services Corp., et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael F. Marino +1 212 309 1000 +1 703 714 7410
No Logo Globe Aviation Services Corproation, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James P. Connors +12828 +12 128 2828
No Logo Huntleigh USA Corp., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan J. Ross - PHV +1 713 651 9366
No Logo UAL Corporation, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Miles Freiman +1 212 319 1000
No Logo World Trade Center Properties LLC, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Flemming Zulack Williamson Zauderer, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Arthur Williamson +1 212 412 9500 +1 212 964 9200 rwilliamson@fzw.com
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 05-0182, 05-0184
Lower Court Decision Date 1/11/2006
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 12 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 11 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2006.
      LREF
      Blank 10 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: None
      Brief of respondent World Trade Center Properties, LLC in opposition filed.
        LREF
        Blank 9 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: None
        Waiver of right of respondents Argenbright Security, Inc. to respond filed.
          LREF
          Blank 8 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: None
          Waiver of right of respondents Burns International Security Services Corp., et al. to respond filed.
            LREF
            Blank 7 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: None
            Waiver of right of respondents AMR Corporation, et al. to respond filed.
              LREF
              Blank 6 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: None
              Waiver of right of respondent Globe Aviation Services Corproation, et al. to respond filed.
                LREF
                Blank 5 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: None
                Waiver of right of respondent Huntleigh USA Corp. to respond filed.
                  LREF
                  Blank 4 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: None
                  Waiver of right of respondent Boeing Company to respond filed.
                    LREF
                    Blank 3 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: None
                    Waiver of right of respondents UAL Corporation, et al. to respond filed.
                      LREF
                      Blank 2 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: None
                      Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 14, 2006, for all respondents.
                        LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: None
                        Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 15, 2006)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 20 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?