John D. Crowley, Petitioner v. United States
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 05-147

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo John D. Crowley, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by KATOR, PARKS & WEISER, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Kator +1 202 898 4800 +1 202 289 1389 mkator@katorparks.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Respondent
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D. Clement +1 202 514 2217
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 04-5034
Lower Court Decision Date 2/17/2005
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 5 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 23, 2005.
      LREF
      Blank 4 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: None
      Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
        LREF
        Blank 3 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: None
        Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including October 28, 2005.
          LREF
          Blank 2 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: None
          Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 28, 2005.
            LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: None
            Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 29, 2005)
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 22 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?