Robert White, Petitioner v. John A. Burdick, Jr., Trustee
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 05-8146

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Robert White, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ROBERT WHITE +1 479 965 0903
v.
No Logo John A. Burdick, Jr., Trustee, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by cwg11.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Goldberg +1 617 951 2505 +1 617 951 0679 goldberg@cwg11.com
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 05-1060
Lower Court Decision Date 9/12/2005
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: None
Rehearing DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 7 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 14, 2006.
      LREF
      Blank 6 Filed: 3/11/2006, Entered: None
      Petition for Rehearing filed.
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: None
        Petition DENIED.
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: None
          DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2006.
            LREF
            Blank 3 Filed: 1/29/2006, Entered: None
            Reply of petitioner Robert White filed.
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: None
              Brief of respondent John A. Burdick, Jr., Trustee in opposition filed.
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: None
                Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 18, 2006)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 11 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?