Russell P. Butler, Petitioner v. United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas, et al.
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 06-1074

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Russell P. Butler, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Arizona Voice for Crime Victims,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steve Twist 1 +1 +1 +1
v.
Lay, Kenneth L Lay, Kenneth L, Respondent
Officially listed as "Kenneth L.Lay"

Toggle Switch Represented by Buckley Sandler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space SAMUEL J. BUFFONE +1 202 349 7940 sbuffone@buckleysandler.com
No Logo United States District Court For The Southern District Of Texas, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D. Clement +1 202 514 2217
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 06-20848
Lower Court Decision Date 11/1/2006
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 4 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 13, 2007.
      LREF
      Blank 3 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None
      Brief of respondent Estate of Kenneth L. Lay in opposition filed.
        LREF
        Blank 2 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: None
        Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
          LREF
          Blank 1 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: None
          Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 5, 2007)
            LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 32 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?