James A. Metz, Sr., Petitioner v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 07-1159

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo James A. Metz, Sr., Petitioner

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space C., C. Marshall Friedman, P. +1 314 621 8400
v.
No Logo Csx Transportation, Inc., Respondent

Represented by CLARK PARTINGTON HART ETC - PENSACOLA FL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DENNIS K LARRY +1 850 434 9200 +4327 432 432 7340 dlarry@cphlaw.com

Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dan Himmelfarb +1 202 263 3000 dhimmelfarb@mayerbrown.com
Lower Court District Court of Appeal of Florida, First District
Lower Court Case No(s). 1D07-0617
Lower Court Decision Date 10/29/2007
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 8 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None
    Reply of petitioner James A. Metz, Sr. filed. (Distributed)
      LREF
      Blank 7 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: None
      DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 29, 2008.
        LREF
        Blank 6 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: None
        Brief of respondent CSX Transportation, Inc. in opposition filed.
          LREF
          Blank 5 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None
          Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 4, 2008.
            LREF
            Blank 4 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None
            Response Requested . (Due May 5, 2008)
              LREF
              Blank 3 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: None
              DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 18, 2008.
                LREF
                Blank 2 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: None
                Waiver of right of respondent CSX Transportation, Inc. to respond filed.
                  LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: None
                  Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 11, 2008)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 1 time.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?