Kirk Pritchard, Petitioner v. Immigration and Naturalization Service
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 07-1360

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kirk Pritchard, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas F Broder +21253 639 00x4808 +1 212 536 3901 douglas.broder@klgates.com
v.
No Logo Immigration & Naturalization Service, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory G. Garre +1 202 514 2217
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 05-6167
Lower Court Decision Date 1/8/2008
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 4 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 3 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 19, 2008.
      LREF
      Blank 2 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None
      Waiver of right of respondent Immigration and Naturalization Service to respond filed.
        LREF
        Blank 1 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None
        Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 29, 2008)
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 13 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?