Troy Villar, Petitioner v. Florida Department of Corrections
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 07-7564

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Troy Villar, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Troy Villar 1 +18 +18 1888
v.
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Florida Dept. of Corrections

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Beverly Bartlett Brewster +1 850 717 3605
Lower Court District Court of Appeal of Florida, First District
Lower Court Case No(s). 06-6099
Lower Court Decision Date 7/13/2007
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 4 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 3 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 4, 2008.
      LREF
      Blank 2 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None
      Waiver of right of respondent Florida Department of Corrections to respond filed.
        LREF
        Blank 1 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: None
        Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 10, 2007)
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 1 time.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?