Ivan Ficken, Petitioner v. Condoleezza Rice, Secretary of State, et al.
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 07-8383

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ivan Ficken, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ivan Ficken 1 +11 +11 1111
v.
No Logo Carolina Lundebye and Stein Lundebye, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clark R. Silcox +1 202 887 1779
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Respondent
Officially listed as "Condoleezza Rice, Secretary of State, et al."
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D. Clement +1 202 514 2217
No Logo French International School, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth M. Willner +1 202 551 1700 kenwillner@paulhastings.com
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 06-5322
Lower Court Decision Date 8/22/2007
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: None
Rehearing DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 8 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 11, 2008.
      LREF
      Blank 7 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None
      Petition for Rehearing filed.
        LREF
        Blank 6 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: None
        Petition DENIED.
          LREF
          Blank 5 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: None
          DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 15, 2008.
            LREF
            Blank 4 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: None
            Waiver of right of respondent French International School to respond filed.
              LREF
              Blank 3 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: None
              Waiver of right of respondents Carolina Lundebye and Stein Lundebye to respond filed.
                LREF
                Blank 2 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: None
                Waiver of right of respondents Condoleezza Rice, Secretary of State, et al. to respond filed.
                  LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None
                  Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 22, 2008)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 8 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?