Robert White, Petitioner v. Joseph B. Collins, Chapter 7 Trustee
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 07-949

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Robert White, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by po box 750 Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert I. White +580039 713 658 2524
v.
No Logo Joseph B. Collins, Chapter 7 Trustee for CK Liquidation Corporation, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by cwg11.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Goldberg +1 617 951 2505 +1 617 951 0679 goldberg@cwg11.com
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 06-2423
Lower Court Decision Date 6/29/2007
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 5 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 21, 2008.
      LREF
      Blank 4 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None
      Reply of petitioner Robert White filed.
        LREF
        Blank 3 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: None
        Brief of respondent Joseph B. Collins, Chapter 7 Trustee for CK Liquidation Corporation in opposition filed.
          LREF
          Blank 2 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None
          Appendix of Robert White filed.
            LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None
            Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 21, 2008)
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 13 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?