Yasin Muhammed Basardh, Petitioner v. Robert M. Gates, Secretary of Defense, et al.
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 08-10982

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Yasin Muhammed Basardh, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen R. Sady +1 503 326 2123 +1 503 326 5524 steve_sady@fd.org
v.
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Respondent
Officially listed as "Robert M. Gates, Secretary of Defense, et al."
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald B. Verrilli +1 202 514 2217 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 09-5203
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 7 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: None
    Letter, dated October 27, 2009, received from counsel for the petitioner. (Distributed)
      LREF
      Blank 6 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None
      DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 30, 2009.
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None
        Reply of petitioner Yasin Muhammed Basardh filed.
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: None
          Brief of respondents Robert M. Gates, Secretary of Defense, et al. in opposition filed.
            LREF
            Blank 3 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None
            Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including September 23, 2009.
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: None
              Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 24, 2009.
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: None
                Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 23, 2009)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 46 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?