Maria C. Fernandez, Petitioner v. Michael V. Hayden, Director, National Security Agency
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 08-1326

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Maria C. Fernandez, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by po box 750 Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terry B Blair +1 410 664 4586 +1 410 664 4587 terrybblairatty@aol.com
v.
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Respondent
Officially listed as "Michael V. Hayden, Director, National Security Agency"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald B. Verrilli +1 202 514 2217 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 08-1118
Lower Court Decision Date 1/12/2009
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 4 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 3 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 4, 2009.
      LREF
      Blank 2 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None
      Waiver of right of respondent Michael V. Hayden, Director, National Security Agency to respond filed.
        LREF
        Blank 1 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: None
        Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 29, 2009)
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 9 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?