Jennifer K. Harbury, Petitioner v. Michael V. Hayden, Director, Central Intelligence Agency, et al.
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 08-15

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
SpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jennifer K. Harbury, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Texas Rio Grande Legal Aid, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Harbury +1 956 447 4800
v.
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Respondent
Officially listed as "Michael V. Hayden, Director, Central Intelligence Agency, et al."
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory G. Garre +1 202 514 2217
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 06-5282
Lower Court Decision Date 4/15/2008
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 4 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 3 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 29, 2008.
      LREF
      Blank 2 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: None
      Waiver of right of respondent Michael V. Hayden, Director, Central Intelligence Agency, et al. to respond filed.
        LREF
        Blank 1 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None
        Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 1, 2008)
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 1 time.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?