Billy Ray Smith, Petitioner v. Florida Department of Corrections
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 08-6800

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Billy Ray Smith, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Billy Ray Smith 1 +15 +15 1555
v.
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Capitol Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Celia Ann Terenzio +1 561 837 5000 +8375 837 837 5099 Celia.Terenzio@myfloridalegal.com
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 08-11046-G
Lower Court Decision Date 7/10/2008
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
Rehearing DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 6 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 24, 2009.
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: None
      Petition for Rehearing filed.
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
        Petition DENIED.
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
          Waiver of right of respondent Florida Department of Corrections to respond filed.
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None
            DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 9, 2009.
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
              Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 17, 2008)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 1 time.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?