James E. Pietrangelo, II, Petitioner v. Robert M. Gates, Secretary of Defense, et al.
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 08-824

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo James E. Pietrangelo, II, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James E. Pietrangelo +548 802 338 0501
v.
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Respondent
Officially listed as "Robert M. Gates, Secretary of Defense, et al."
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald B. Verrilli +1 202 514 2217 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
No Logo Thomas Cook, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Rusell Englert Orseck Untereiner & Sauber, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roy T. Englert, Jr. +1 202 775 4503 +1 202 775 4510 renglert@robbinsrussell.com
Related Case 08A355
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 06-2313, 06-2381
Lower Court Decision Date 6/9/2008
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None
    Motion of petitioner to strike the brief of the Cook respondents is denied. The motion of petitioner to seal Attachment A to the motion to strike is granted. The motion of the Cook respondents to withdraw the brief filed January 26, 2009, is granted. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied.
      LREF
      Blank 14 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: None
      DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 4, 2009.
        LREF
        Blank 13 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None
        Brief of the Federal Respondents in opposition filed.
          LREF
          Blank 12 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None
          Brief of respondents Thomas Cook, et al. filed.
            LREF
            Blank 11 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: None
            Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including May 6, 2009, for all respondents.
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None
              Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including April 6, 2009, for all respondents.
                LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None
                Reply of petitioner to opposition to motion to strike filed.
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None
                  Notice in response to petitioner's motion to strike received.
                    LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None
                    Opposition to motion to strike filed by Cook respondents.
                      LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None
                      Motion to strike brief for the Cook respondents and to seal Attachment A to the motion filed by petitioner.
                        LREF
                        Blank 5 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: None
                        Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 6, 2009.
                          LREF
                          Blank 4 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
                          Brief of respondents Thomas Cook, et al. filed.
                            LREF
                            Blank 3 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None
                            Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 4, 2009)
                              LREF
                              Blank 2 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                              Application (08A355) granted by Justice Souter extending the time to file until January 5, 2009.
                                LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                Application (08A355) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 6, 2008 to January 5, 2009, submitted to Justice Souter.
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 9 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?