Sammy R. McKnight, Petitioner v. Robert M. Gates, Secretary of Defense
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 08-880

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Sammy R. McKnight, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by MELVILLE JOHNSON, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Melville Johnson +1 404 524 9111 +1 404 524 6611 gjohnson@melvillejohnson.com
v.
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Respondent
Officially listed as "Robert M. Gates, Secretary of Defense"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by Deputy Solicitor General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edwin S. +1 202 514 2217
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 07-5853
Lower Court Decision Date 6/20/2008
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 4 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 3 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 20, 2009.
      LREF
      Blank 2 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None
      Waiver of right of respondent Robert M. Gates, Secretary of Defense to respond filed.
        LREF
        Blank 1 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: None
        Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 12, 2009)
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 39 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?