Willie S. Phillips, et al., Petitioners v. Robert M. Gates, Secretary of Defense
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 09-151

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Willie S. Phillips, et al., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by MCNEES, WALLACE & NURICK

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samuel Neal Lillard +1 614 469 8000 +1 614 469 4653 slillard@mwncmh.com
v.
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Respondent
Officially listed as "Robert M. Gates, Secretary of Defense"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald B. Verrilli +1 202 514 2217 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 07-3515
Lower Court Decision Date 5/5/2009
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 4 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 3 Filed: 8/26/2009, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 29, 2009.
      LREF
      Blank 2 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None
      Waiver of right of respondent Robert M. Gates, Secretary of Defense to respond filed.
        LREF
        Blank 1 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: None
        Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 8, 2009)
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 4 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?