Saifullah Paracha, Petitioner v. Robert M. Gates, Secretary of Defense
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 09-5583

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Saifullah Paracha, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gaillard T. Hunt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gaillard Thomas Hunt +1 301 530 2807 +1 301 564 6059 ghunt@mdo.net
v.
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Respondent
Officially listed as "Robert M. Gates, Secretary of Defense"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald B. Verrilli +1 202 514 2217 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 06-1038
Lower Court Decision Date 3/26/2009
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 6 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 24, 2009.
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None
      Reply of petitioner Saifullah Paracha filed.
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None
        Brief of respondent Robert M. Gates, Secretary of Defense in opposition filed.
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: None
          Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including October 30, 2009.
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: None
            Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 30, 2009.
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: None
              Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 31, 2009)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 1 time.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?