Mustafa Al Uzayti, aka Abu Faraj Al Libbi, Petitioner v. Robert M. Gates, Secretary of Defense
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 09-5708

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mustafa Al Uzayti, aka Abu Faraj Al Libbi, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by MARGOLIS EDELSTEIN & SCHERLIS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David L. McColgin +1 215 928 1100
v.
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Respondent
Officially listed as "Robert M. Gates, Secretary of Defense"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald B. Verrilli +1 202 514 2217 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 07-1527
Lower Court Decision Date 4/24/2009
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 6 Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: None
    Reply of petitioner Mustafa Al Uzayti, aka Abu Faraj Al Libbi filed. (Distributed)
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: None
      DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 4, 2009.
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None
        Brief of respondent Robert M. Gates, Secretary of Defense in opposition filed.
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: None
          Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 4, 2009.
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: None
            Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 5, 2009.
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None
              Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 3, 2009)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 5 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?