Abd Al-Rahim Hussain Mohammed Al-Nashiri, Petitioner v. Robert M. Gates, Secretary of Defense
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 09-5812

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Abd Al-Rahim Hussain Mohammed Al-Nashiri, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul G. Turner +1 702 388 6577 paul_turner@fd.org
v.
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Respondent
Officially listed as "Robert M. Gates, Secretary of Defense"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald B. Verrilli +1 202 514 2217 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 08-1007
Lower Court Decision Date 4/24/2009
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 5 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 11, 2009.
      LREF
      Blank 4 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: None
      Brief of respondent Robert M. Gates, Secretary of Defense in opposition filed.
        LREF
        Blank 3 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: None
        Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 9, 2009.
          LREF
          Blank 2 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
          Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 9, 2009.
            LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None
            Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 9, 2009)
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 77 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?