Adam Trotter, Petitioner v. Robert M. Gates, Secretary of Defense
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 09-6601

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Adam Trotter, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by po box 750 Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam Trotter +4171 781 859 7160
v.
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Respondent
Officially listed as "Robert M. Gates, Secretary of Defense"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald B. Verrilli +1 202 514 2217 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 06-56864
Lower Court Decision Date 8/1/2008
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: None
Rehearing DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 6 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 8, 2010.
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: None
      Petition for Rehearing filed.
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None
        Petition DENIED.
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None
          DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 30, 2009.
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: None
            Waiver of right of respondent Robert M. Gates, Secretary of Defense to respond filed.
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: None
              Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 22, 2009)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 2 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?