Fayad Yahya Ahmed, Petitioner v. Robert M. Gates, Secretary of Defense
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 09-7547

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Fayad Yahya Ahmed, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by 1001 Fourth Avenue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David S. Marshall +1 206 826 1400 +1 206 389 1708 dmarshall@davidsmarshall.com
v.
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Respondent
Officially listed as "Robert M. Gates, Secretary of Defense"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald B. Verrilli +1 202 514 2217 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 07-1442
Lower Court Decision Date 3/26/2009
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 7 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 19, 2010.
      LREF
      Blank 6 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: None
      Waiver of right of respondent Robert M. Gates, Secretary of Defense to respond filed.
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None
        Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 15, 2010.
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None
          Motion (09M48) of petitioner for leave to proceed in forma pauperis without an affidavit of indigency executed by petitioner Granted.
            LREF
            Blank 3 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: None
            MOTION (09M48) DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 13, 2009.
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: None
              Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 16, 2009)
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: None
                Motion (09M48) of petitioner for leave to proceed in forma pauperis without an affidavit of indigency executed by petitioner filed.
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 17 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?