Henry J. LaFavors, Petitioner v. Florida Department of Corrections
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 09-8533

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Henry J. LaFavors, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space HENRY JAMES LAFAVORS
v.
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Helene C. Hvizd +1 561 837 5000
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 09-13170
Lower Court Decision Date 9/25/2009
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
Rehearing DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 6 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 27, 2010.
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
      Petition for Rehearing filed.
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None
        Petition DENIED.
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None
          DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 19, 2010.
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None
            Waiver of right of respondent Florida Department of Corrections to respond filed.
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: None
              Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 11, 2010)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 2 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?