Yaser A. Albahri, Petitioner v. Florida
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 10-10051

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Yaser A. Albahri, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael Ufferman Law Firm, P. A.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Ufferman +1 850 386 2345 ufferman@uffermanlaw.com
v.
No Logo Florida, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward C. Hill +1 850 414 3300
Lower Court District Court of Appeal of Florida, First District
Lower Court Case No(s). 1D08-5970
Lower Court Decision Date 1/13/2011
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 6 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2011.
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None
      Petitioner complied with order of June 13, 2011.
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: None
        The motion of petitioner for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied. Petitioner is allowed until July 5, 2011, within which to pay the docketing fee required by Rule 38(a) and to submit a petition in compliance with Rule 33.1 of the Rules of this Court.
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None
          DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 9, 2011.
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None
            Waiver of right of respondent Florida to respond filed.
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
              Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 19, 2011)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 6,687 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?