Arlene Dugmore, Petitioner v. Mary Lattimore, Warden
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 10-11192

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Arlene Dugmore, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Verna Wefald +1 626 577 2658 +1 626 685 2562 vwefald@earthlink.net
v.
No Logo Mary Lattimore, Warden, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Xiomara Costello +1 213 897 2277 Xiomara.Costello@doj.ca.gov
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 09-55206
Lower Court Decision Date 2/16/2011
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 4 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 3 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2011.
      LREF
      Blank 2 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None
      Waiver of right of respondent Mary Lattimore, Warden to respond filed.
        LREF
        Blank 1 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
        Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 25, 2011)
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 114 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?