Bryan Sousa, Petitioner v. Arthur Roque, Jr., et al.
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 10-1409

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bryan Sousa, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
v.
No Logo Arthur Roque, Jr., et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Connecticut Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clare E. Kindall +1 860 827 2683 +1 860 827 2893 Clare.Kindall@ct.gov
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 10-1281
Lower Court Decision Date 2/22/2011
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 4 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 3 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2011.
      LREF
      Blank 2 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None
      Brief of respondents Arthur Roque, Jr., et al. in opposition filed.
        LREF
        Blank 1 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
        Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 17, 2011)
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 19 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?