Bob Barr, et al., Petitioners v. William F. Galvin, in His Official Capacity as Secretary of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 10-1456

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Bob Barr, et al., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Reinstein +1 617 482 3170 +1 617 451 0009 reinstein@aclum.org
v.
No Logo William F. Galvin, in His Official Capacity as Secretary of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy Spector
Related Case 10A932
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 09-2426
Lower Court Decision Date 11/16/2010
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 8 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
    Motion to defer consideration filed by petitioner DENIED.
      LREF
      Blank 7 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
      Letter of July 6, 2011, received from counsel for the petitioners. (Distributed)
        LREF
        Blank 6 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
        DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2011.
          LREF
          Blank 5 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: None
          Waiver of right of respondent William F. Galvin, in His Official Capacity as Secretary of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts to respond filed.
            LREF
            Blank 4 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
            Motion to defer consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari filed by petitioners.
              LREF
              Blank 3 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
              Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 1, 2011)
                LREF
                Blank 2 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                Application (10A932) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file until May 27, 2011.
                  LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
                  Application (10A932) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 28, 2011 to May 27, 2011, submitted to Justice Breyer.
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 4 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?