Jason Futch, Petitioner v. Georgia
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 10-5199

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Jason Futch, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by McIntyre & Associates - ATL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Kennedy +1 404 879 1515 mkm@georgiapostconviction.com
v.
No Logo Georgia, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Georgia Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paula K. Smith +1 404 656 3351 psmith@law.ga.gov
Related Case 09A936
Lower Court Supreme Court of Georgia
Lower Court Case No(s). S09A1544
Lower Court Decision Date 1/25/2010
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None
Petition DENIED.
    LREF
    Blank 5 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None
    DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 27, 2010.
      LREF
      Blank 4 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
      Waiver of right of respondent Georgia to respond filed.
        LREF
        Blank 3 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None
        Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 6, 2010)
          LREF
          Blank 2 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
          Application (09A936) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until June 24, 2010.
            LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None
            Application (09A936) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 25, 2010 to June 24, 2010, submitted to Justice Thomas.
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 5 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?